VA SB631 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 4 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-04 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0640)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 4 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-04 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0640)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Authorities for development of former federal areas; dissolution. Provides that such authorities that are created by proclamation of the Governor prior to January 1, 1997, may be dissolved by the affected locality or localities without a proclamation of the Governor. The bill has an expiration date of July 1, 2016.
Title
Authorities for development of former federal areas; dissolution.
Sponsors
Sen. Jill Vogel [R] |
Roll Calls
2014-03-04 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-28 - House - House: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Local Government with amendment (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-28 - House - House: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Local Government with amendment (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-04 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0640) | |
2014-04-04 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 640 (effective 7/1/14) | |
2014-03-09 | Senate | Signed by President |
2014-03-06 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB631ER) |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Enrolled |
2014-03-04 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N) |
2014-03-04 | House | Passed House BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N) |
2014-03-04 | House | Read third time |
2014-03-03 | House | Read second time |
2014-02-28 | House | Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns (22-Y 0-N) |
2014-02-14 | House | Assigned CC & T sub: Subcommittee #2 |
2014-02-12 | House | Referred to Committee on Counties, Cities and Towns |
2014-02-12 | House | Read first time |
2014-02-12 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2014-02-10 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2014-02-07 | Senate | Printed as engrossed 14103521D-E |
2014-02-07 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate as amended SB631E |
2014-02-07 | Senate | Committee amendment agreed to |
2014-02-07 | Senate | Reading of amendment waived |
2014-02-07 | Senate | Read second time |
2014-02-06 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2014-02-04 | Senate | Reported from Local Government with amendment (15-Y 0-N) |
2014-01-17 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Local Government |
2014-01-17 | Senate | Presented and ordered printed 14103521D |