VA SB612 | 2008 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 29 2008 - 100% progression
Action: 2008-03-04 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0058)
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 29 2008 - 100% progression
Action: 2008-03-04 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0058)
Summary
Nonrenewal of liability, fire, and motor vehicle insurance policies. Establishes exceptions to prohibitions on the refusal to renew certain liability, fire, and motor vehicle insurance policies. Such renewal provisions will not apply to an insurer if an affiliated insurer has manifested its willingness to provide coverage at a lower premium than would have been charged for the same exposures on the expiring policy.
Title
Liability, fire, and motor vehicle insurance policies; establishes exceptions to prohibitions.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2008-03-04 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0058) | |
2008-02-29 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 58 (effective 7/1/08) | |
2008-02-22 | Senate: Signed by President | |
2008-02-20 | House: Signed by Speaker | |
2008-02-20 | Senate: Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB612ER) | |
2008-02-20 | Senate: Enrolled | |
2008-02-19 | House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) | |
2008-02-19 | House: Passed House BLOCK VOTE (97-Y 0-N) | |
2008-02-19 | House: Read third time | |
2008-02-18 | House: Read second time | |
2008-02-14 | House: Reported from Commerce and Labor (22-Y 0-N) | |
2008-02-13 | House: Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor | |
2008-02-13 | House: Read first time | |
2008-02-13 | House: Placed on Calendar | |
2008-02-08 | Senate: Communicated to House | |
2008-02-08 | Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) | |
2008-02-08 | Senate: Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) | |
2008-02-08 | Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) | |
2008-02-07 | Senate: Read second time and engrossed | |
2008-02-06 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) | |
2008-02-04 | Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor (15-Y 0-N) | |
2008-01-09 | Senate: Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor | |
2008-01-09 | Senate: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/08 080569328 |
Subjects
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?081+sum+SB612 |