VA SB598 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 29 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-02-29 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0066)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 29 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-02-29 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0066)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Erosion and sediment control; stormwater management program. Clarifies that certain flow rate capacity and velocity requirements for plans approved on and after July 1, 2014, shall be satisfied by compliance with Virginia Stormwater Management Program (VSMP) Regulations where the land-disturbing activity is conducted in accordance with extended permit coverage regulations.
Title
Erosion and sediment control; compliance with stormwater management program.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-02-19 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-17 - House - House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources with substitite (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-17 - House - House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources with substitite (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-29 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0066) | |
2016-02-29 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 66 (effective 7/1/16) | |
2016-02-22 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, February 29, 2016 | |
2016-02-22 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on 2/22/16 |
2016-02-22 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2016-02-22 | Senate | Signed by President |
2016-02-22 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB598ER) |
2016-02-22 | Senate | Enrolled |
2016-02-19 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-19 | House | Passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-19 | House | Read third time |
2016-02-18 | House | Read second time |
2016-02-17 | House | Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources (21-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-12 | House | Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources |
2016-02-12 | House | Read first time |
2016-02-12 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2016-02-10 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-09 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB598S1 |
2016-02-09 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 16104403D-S1 |
2016-02-09 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2016-02-09 | Senate | Read second time |
2016-02-08 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-04 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 16104403D-S1 |
2016-02-04 | Senate | Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources with substitite (15-Y 0-N) |
2016-01-13 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources |
2016-01-13 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/16 16102415D |