VA SB592 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 25 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-25 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0496)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 25 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-25 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0496)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Vital records; amending death certificates. Creates a process for amending certain information on a death certificate registered with the State Registrar. The bill requires a court order to change the name of the deceased, the deceased's parent, or the informant; the marital status of the deceased; or the place of residence of the deceased, when the place of residence is changed to a jurisdiction outside of the Commonwealth. The bill requires an affidavit testifying to corrected information for other types of changes. The bill requires the Board of Health to promulgate regulations concerning the amendment process and creates an appeals process for rejected amendments.
Title
Vital records; amending death certificates.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-02-29 - Senate - Senate: House substitute agreed to by Senate (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-25 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE #2 (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 103 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-25 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-23 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-18 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (9-Y 0-N) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (36-Y 0-N) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-28 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-25 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE #2 (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 103 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-25 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-23 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-18 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (9-Y 0-N) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (36-Y 0-N) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-28 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-25 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0496) | |
2016-03-25 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 496 (effective 7/1/16) | |
2016-03-07 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, Sunday, April 10, 2016 | |
2016-03-07 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on 3/7/2016 |
2016-03-04 | Senate | Signed by President |
2016-03-01 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2016-03-01 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB592ER) |
2016-03-01 | Senate | Enrolled |
2016-02-29 | Senate | Title replaced 16105657D-H1 |
2016-02-29 | Senate | House substitute agreed to by Senate (38-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-25 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE #2 (100-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-25 | House | Passed House with substitute BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-25 | House | Reconsideration of House passage agreed to by House |
2016-02-25 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-25 | House | Passed House with substitute BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-25 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute SB592H1 |
2016-02-25 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 16105657D-H1 |
2016-02-25 | House | Read third time |
2016-02-24 | House | Read second time |
2016-02-23 | House | Committee substitute printed 16105657D-H1 |
2016-02-23 | House | Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with substitute (22-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-18 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (9-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-16 | House | Assigned HWI sub: Subcommittee #2 |
2016-02-05 | House | Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions |
2016-02-05 | House | Read first time |
2016-02-05 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2016-02-02 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-01 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB592S1 |
2016-02-01 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 16104699D-S1 |
2016-02-01 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2016-02-01 | Senate | Read second time |
2016-01-29 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (36-Y 0-N) |
2016-01-28 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 16104699D-S1 |
2016-01-28 | Senate | Reported from Education and Health with substitute (15-Y 0-N) |
2016-01-13 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education and Health |
2016-01-13 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/16 16101791D |