VA SB570 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 14 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-03-10 - House: Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 14 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-03-10 - House: Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Circuit courts; number of judges; Tenth Circuit. Adds a fourth circuit court judge to the Tenth Judicial Circuit.
Title
Circuit court judges; increases number in Tenth Judicial Circuit.
Sponsors
Sen. Frank Ruff [R] |
Roll Calls
2012-02-20 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance with amendment (14-Y 0-N 1-A) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-01-23 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance with amendment (14-Y 0-N 1-A) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-01-23 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-10 | House: Left in Appropriations | |
2012-03-01 | House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table by voice vote | |
2012-02-21 | House: Assigned App. sub: General Government | |
2012-02-20 | House: Referred to Committee on Appropriations | |
2012-02-20 | House: Reported from Courts of Justice (16-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-16 | House: Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice | |
2012-02-16 | House: Read first time | |
2012-02-16 | House: Placed on Calendar | |
2012-02-14 | Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-14 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-14 | Senate: Printed as engrossed 12103234D-E | |
2012-02-14 | Senate: Engrossed by Senate as amended SB570E | |
2012-02-14 | Senate: Committee amendment agreed to | |
2012-02-14 | Senate: Reading of amendment waived | |
2012-02-14 | Senate: Read second time | |
2012-02-13 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-09 | Senate: Reported from Finance with amendment (14-Y 0-N 1-A) | |
2012-01-23 | Senate: Rereferred to Finance | |
2012-01-23 | Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice (15-Y 0-N) | |
2012-01-18 | Senate: Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice | |
2012-01-18 | Senate: Presented and ordered printed 12103234D |