VA SB565 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 23 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-23 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0803)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 23 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-23 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0803)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Commercial driver's licenses, etc.; compliance with federal requirements. Amends several sections relating to commercial driver's licenses to comply with new Federal Motor Carrier Safety Administration requirements relating to commercial motor vehicles and prohibited use of hand held mobile telephones in commercial vehicles. The bill also requires distracted driving to be included as a part of the driver's license knowledge examination to comply with MAP-21(Moving Ahead for Progress in the 21st Century, P.L. 112-141). In addition, the bill provides that DMV may continue to disclose personal information from crash reports, but only if otherwise authorized by law in order to comply with federal law.
Title
Commercial driver's licenses, etc.; compliance with federal requirements.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-04-23 - Senate - Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-23 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (87-Y 4-N) (Y: 89 N: 4 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-24 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (82-Y 15-N) (Y: 82 N: 17 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-18 - House - House: Reported from Transportation (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-24 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (34-Y 0-N) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-22 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Transportation (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-23 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (87-Y 4-N) (Y: 89 N: 4 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-24 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (82-Y 15-N) (Y: 82 N: 17 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-18 - House - House: Reported from Transportation (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-24 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (34-Y 0-N) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-22 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Transportation (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-23 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0803) | |
2014-04-23 | House | Enacted, Chapter 803 (effective 7/1/14) |
2014-04-23 | House | Signed by Speaker as reenrolled |
2014-04-23 | Senate | Signed by President as reenrolled |
2014-04-23 | Senate | Reenrolled bill text (SB565ER2) |
2014-04-23 | Senate | Reenrolled |
2014-04-23 | Governor: Governor's recommendation adopted | |
2014-04-23 | House | House concurred in Governor's recommendation (87-Y 4-N) |
2014-04-23 | Senate | Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (39-Y 0-N) |
2014-04-23 | House | VOTE: ADOPTION (87-Y 4-N) |
2014-04-22 | Senate | Placed on Calendar |
2014-04-06 | Senate | Governor's recommendation received by Senate |
2014-02-28 | Senate | Signed by President |
2014-02-26 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2014-02-26 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB565ER) |
2014-02-26 | Senate | Enrolled |
2014-02-24 | House | VOTE: PASSAGE (82-Y 15-N) |
2014-02-24 | House | Passed House (82-Y 15-N) |
2014-02-24 | House | Read third time |
2014-02-21 | House | Passed by for the day |
2014-02-20 | House | Passed by for the day |
2014-02-19 | House | Read second time |
2014-02-18 | House | Reported from Transportation (22-Y 0-N) |
2014-02-07 | House | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2014-02-07 | House | Read first time |
2014-02-07 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2014-01-29 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2014-01-28 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2014-01-27 | Senate | Read second time and engrossed |
2014-01-24 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (34-Y 0-N) |
2014-01-22 | Senate | Reported from Transportation (14-Y 0-N) |
2014-01-08 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2014-01-08 | Senate | Presented and ordered printed 14103234D |
Same As/Similar To
HB662 (Same As) 2014-03-03 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0077)
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
46 | 2 | 1078.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 341.10 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 341.12 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 341.14 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 341.14:01 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 341.14:1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 341.14:2 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 341.14:5 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 341.14:6 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 341.16 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 341.20 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 341.20:2 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 341.20:4 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 341.20:5 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 341.20:6 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 341.4 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 341.8 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 348 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 379 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |