VA SB532 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 8 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-08 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0262)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 8 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-08 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0262)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibition on wearing a mask; public emergency exception. Adds to the existing exemptions in the section making it a Class 6 felony for a person over the age of 16 to wear a mask in public or on private property without the owner's written consent an exception when the Governor has declared a disaster or state of emergency in response to a public health emergency and defines the mask appropriate for the emergency.
Title
Masks; prohibition on wearing in certain places, exception.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-03-02 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-26 - House - House: Reported from Militia, Police and Public Safety (20-Y 0-N) (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with amendment (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-26 - House - House: Reported from Militia, Police and Public Safety (20-Y 0-N) (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with amendment (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-08 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0262) | |
2010-04-08 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 262 (effective 7/1/10) | |
2010-03-12 | Senate: Signed by President | |
2010-03-10 | House: Signed by Speaker | |
2010-03-10 | Senate: Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB532ER) | |
2010-03-10 | Senate: Enrolled | |
2010-03-02 | House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) | |
2010-03-02 | House: Passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) | |
2010-03-02 | House: Read third time | |
2010-03-01 | House: Read second time | |
2010-02-26 | House: Reported from Militia, Police and Public Safety (20-Y 0-N) | |
2010-02-16 | House: Referred to Committee on Militia, Police and Public Safety | |
2010-02-16 | House: Read first time | |
2010-02-16 | House: Placed on Calendar | |
2010-02-04 | Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) | |
2010-02-03 | Senate: Printed as engrossed 10102012D-E | |
2010-02-03 | Senate: Engrossed by Senate as amended SB532E | |
2010-02-03 | Senate: Committee amendment agreed to | |
2010-02-03 | Senate: Reading of amendment waived | |
2010-02-03 | Senate: Read second time | |
2010-02-02 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) | |
2010-02-01 | Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with amendment (13-Y 0-N) | |
2010-01-14 | Senate: Assigned Courts sub: Criminal | |
2010-01-13 | Senate: Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice | |
2010-01-13 | Senate: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/10 10102012D |
Same As/Similar To
HB869 (Same As) 2010-04-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0420)