VA SB502 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 18 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-18 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0824)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 18 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-18 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0824)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Emissions inspections. Privatizes services now provided by the Department of Environmental Quality related to vehicle emissions inspections. The bill also updates authorized testing equipment and allows use of wireless systems and on-road emissions testing.
Title
Motor vehicle emissions inspections; privatizes services now provided by DEQ, etc.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-04-18 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (96-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-18 - Senate - Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (38-Y 1-N) (Y: 38 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-24 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-21 - House - House: Reported from Transportation (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Transportation with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-18 - Senate - Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (38-Y 1-N) (Y: 38 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-24 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-21 - House - House: Reported from Transportation (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Transportation with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-18 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0824) | |
2012-04-18 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 824 (effective 7/1/12) | |
2012-04-18 | House: Signed by Speaker as reenrolled | |
2012-04-18 | Senate: Signed by President as reenrolled | |
2012-04-18 | Senate: Reenrolled bill text (SB502ER2) | |
2012-04-18 | Senate: Reenrolled | |
2012-04-18 | Governor: Governor's recommendation adopted | |
2012-04-18 | House: VOTE: ADOPTION (96-Y 0-N) | |
2012-04-18 | House: House concurred in Governor's recommendation (96-Y 0-N) | |
2012-04-18 | Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (38-Y 1-N) | |
2012-04-17 | Senate: Placed on Calendar | |
2012-04-09 | Senate: Governor's recommendation received by Senate | |
2012-02-29 | House: Signed by Speaker | |
2012-02-29 | Senate: Signed by President | |
2012-02-29 | Senate: Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB502ER) | |
2012-02-29 | Senate: Enrolled | |
2012-02-24 | House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-24 | House: Passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-24 | House: Read third time | |
2012-02-23 | House: Read second time | |
2012-02-21 | House: Reported from Transportation (21-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-13 | House: Referred to Committee on Transportation | |
2012-02-13 | House: Read first time | |
2012-02-13 | House: Placed on Calendar | |
2012-02-07 | Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-06 | Senate: Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB502S1 | |
2012-02-06 | Senate: Committee substitute agreed to 12104889D-S1 | |
2012-02-06 | Senate: Reading of substitute waived | |
2012-02-06 | Senate: Read second time | |
2012-02-03 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-01 | Senate: Committee substitute printed 12104889D-S1 | |
2012-02-01 | Senate: Reported from Transportation with substitute (15-Y 0-N) | |
2012-01-19 | Senate: Assigned Trans sub: #1 | |
2012-01-11 | Senate: Referred to Committee on Transportation | |
2012-01-11 | Senate: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/12 12103057D |
Same As/Similar To
HB805 (Same As) 2012-03-10 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0216)
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
46 | 2 | 1176 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 1177.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 1178 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 1178.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 1179.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 1182.2 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 1187.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 1187.3 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |