VA SB491 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 4 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-02-18 - Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Inquiry and report of immigration status; persons charged with or convicted of certain crimes. Provides that the provisions requiring (i) jail officers to ascertain the citizenship of any inmate taken into custody at a jail, (ii) officers in charge of correctional facilities to inquire as to the citizenship of any person committed to a correctional facility, and (iii) the mandatory duty of the clerk of a court committing a convicted alien to a correctional facility to furnish related court records to a United States immigration officer, are limited to felony offenses. The bill also provides that the clerk of court report to the Bureau of Immigration and Customs Enforcement of the U.S. Department of Homeland Security any juvenile adjudicated of delinquency or finding of guilt for a violent juvenile felony.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Inquiry and report of immigration status; persons charged with or convicted of certain crimes.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (21-Y 19-N) (Y: 20 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Judiciary (8-Y 3-N) (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-18HouseReferred to Committee for Courts of Justice
2020-02-18HouseRead first time
2020-02-18HousePlaced on Calendar
2020-02-05SenateRead third time and passed Senate (21-Y 19-N)
2020-02-04SenateEngrossed by Senate - floor substitute SB491S1
2020-02-04SenateSubstitute by Senator agreed to 20107555D-S1
2020-02-04SenateReading of substitute waived
2020-02-04SenateRead second time
2020-02-04SenateFloor substitute printed 20107555D-S1 (Surovell)
2020-02-03SenatePassed by for the day
2020-01-31SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N)
2020-01-29SenateReported from Judiciary (8-Y 3-N)
2020-01-08SenateMoved from Courts of Justice to Judiciary due to a change of the committee name
2020-01-07SenateReferred to Committee on the Judiciary
2020-01-07SenatePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20104908D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
161309.1(n/a)See Bill Text
192294.2(n/a)See Bill Text
19283.2(n/a)See Bill Text
531218(n/a)See Bill Text
531219(n/a)See Bill Text
531220.1(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback