VA SB487 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-12-04 - Left in Finance
Pending: Senate Finance and Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-12-04 - Left in Finance
Pending: Senate Finance and Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
DUI maiming; penalty. Raises the penalty for DUI maiming and for operating a motorcraft while intoxicated, causing permanent impairment, from a Class 6 to a Class 4 felony and creates a Class 6 felony when the offense causes serious bodily injury without maiming.
Title
Driving or boating while intoxicated; serious bodily injury, penalty.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Continued to 2015 in Finance (17-Y 0-N) (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Rereferred from Courts of Justice (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Rereferred from Courts of Justice (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-12-04 | Senate | Left in Finance |
2014-02-04 | Senate | Continued to 2015 in Finance (17-Y 0-N) |
2014-01-29 | Senate | Rereferred to Finance |
2014-01-29 | Senate | Rereferred from Courts of Justice (15-Y 0-N) |
2014-01-08 | Senate | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2014-01-08 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/14 14100993D |