VA SB436 | 2008 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on March 4 2008 - 100% progression
Action: 2008-03-05 - Senate: Senate sustained Governor's veto
Status: Vetoed on March 4 2008 - 100% progression
Action: 2008-03-05 - Senate: Senate sustained Governor's veto
Summary
Possession of concealed weapons in vehicles. Creates a new exemption to the general prohibition against carrying concealed weapons by allowing a person who may lawfully possess a firearm to carry a handgun in a private motor vehicle or boat if the handgun is locked in a container or compartment.
Title
Concealed weapons; allows person to carry in private motor vehicle, etc. if locked in container.
Sponsors
Sen. Jill Vogel [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2008-03-05 | Senate: Senate sustained Governor's veto | |
2008-03-05 | Senate: Motion to pass in enrolled form rejected (25-Y 15-N) | |
2008-03-04 | Governor: Vetoed by Governor | |
2008-02-25 | Senate: Signed by President | |
2008-02-22 | House: Signed by Speaker | |
2008-02-22 | Senate: Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB436ER) | |
2008-02-22 | Senate: Enrolled | |
2008-02-21 | House: VOTE: --- PASSAGE (69-Y 29-N) | |
2008-02-21 | House: Passed House (69-Y 29-N) | |
2008-02-21 | House: Pending question ordered | |
2008-02-21 | House: Read third time | |
2008-02-20 | House: Read second time | |
2008-02-18 | House: Reported from Militia, Police and Public Safety (17-Y 4-N) | |
2008-02-12 | House: Referred to Committee on Militia, Police and Public Safety | |
2008-02-12 | House: Read first time | |
2008-02-12 | House: Placed on Calendar | |
2008-02-11 | Senate: Communicated to House | |
2008-02-11 | Senate: Passed Senate (31-Y 9-N) | |
2008-02-11 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 1-N) | |
2008-02-11 | Senate: Read second time and engrossed | |
2008-02-08 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) | |
2008-02-06 | Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice (10-Y 3-N) | |
2008-01-08 | Senate: Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice | |
2008-01-08 | Senate: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/08 086550338 |
Subjects
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?081+sum+SB436 |