VA SB431 | 2012 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-3)
Status: Engrossed on February 9 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-03-10 - House: Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Financial exploitation of elderly or incapacitated adults; penalty. Provides that it is a felony punishable by imprisonment in a state correctional facility for not less than one nor more than 20 years to knowingly and without legal justification, by deception, intimidation, undue influence, coercion, harassment, duress, or misrepresentation, use, obtain, convert, or take control of an incapacitated adult’s money, assets, property, or financial resources with the intent to permanently deprive the adult of the use, benefit, or possession of the property or financial resources. If the violation is by a caregiver or person in a position of trust it is a Class 3 felony. The bill allows forfeiture of personal property used in connection with the crime.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Financial exploitation of elderly or incapacitated adults; penalty.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2012-02-27 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (17-Y 0-N) (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-27 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (9-Y 0-N) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N 1-A) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (8-Y 5-N 1-A) (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2012-03-10 House: Left in Appropriations
2012-02-29 House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table by voice vote
2012-02-28 House: Assigned App. sub: Public Safety
2012-02-27 House: Referred to Committee on Appropriations
2012-02-27 House: Committee substitute printed 12105700D-H1
2012-02-27 House: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (17-Y 0-N)
2012-02-27 House: Subcommittee recommends referring to Committee on Appropriations
2012-02-27 House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (9-Y 0-N)
2012-02-17 House: Assigned Courts sub: #1 Criminal
2012-02-17 House: Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
2012-02-17 House: Read first time
2012-02-17 House: Placed on Calendar
2012-02-10 Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N 1-A)
2012-02-09 Senate: Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB431S1
2012-02-09 Senate: Committee substitute agreed to 12104967D-S1
2012-02-09 Senate: Reading of substitute waived
2012-02-09 Senate: Read second time
2012-02-08 Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
2012-02-07 Senate: Reported from Finance (15-Y 0-N)
2012-02-02 Senate: Incorporates SB443
2012-02-02 Senate: Incorporates SB285
2012-02-02 Senate: Incorporates SB222
2012-02-01 Senate: Rereferred to Finance
2012-02-01 Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (8-Y 5-N 1-A)
2012-02-01 Senate: Committee substitute printed 12104967D-S1
2012-01-11 Senate: Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
2012-01-11 Senate: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/12 12103573D

Same As/Similar To

SB222 (Similar To) 2012-02-01 - Senate: Incorporated by Courts of Justice
SB285 (Similar To) 2012-02-01 - Senate: Incorporated by Courts of Justice
SB443 (Similar To) 2012-02-01 - Senate: Incorporated by Courts of Justice

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
182178.1(n/a)See Bill Text
192386.33(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback