VA SB285 | 2012 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-02-01 - Senate: Incorporated by Courts of Justice
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]

Summary

Crimes against incapacitated or elder adults; penalty. Provides that any person who commits an offense set forth in Chapter 4 (crimes against the person), Chapter 5 (crimes against property), or Chapter 6 (crimes involving fraud) of Title 18.2, knowing or having reason to know that the victim of the offense is an incapacitated or elder adult, is guilty of a separate and distinct Class 1 misdemeanor if the underlying offense is a misdemeanor and a separate and distinct Class 6 felony if the underlying offense is a felony. The bill also provides that if the offender is a person responsible for the care of the victim, punishment shall include a mandatory minimum term of confinement of 30 days if the underlying offense is a misdemeanor and a mandatory minimum term of confinement of six months if the underlying offense is a felony.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Crimes against incapacitated or elder adults; penalty.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2012-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Incorporated by Courts of Justice (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-30 - Senate - Senate: Incorporated by Courts of Justice (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2012-02-01 Senate: Incorporated by Courts of Justice
2012-02-01 Senate: Incorporated by Courts of Justice
2012-02-01 Senate: Incorporated by Courts of Justice
2012-01-10 Senate: Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
2012-01-10 Senate: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/12 12100461D

Same As/Similar To

SB431 (Similar To) 2012-03-10 - House: Left in Appropriations

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
182504.2(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback