VA SB422 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 12 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-08 - Left in Finance
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 12 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-08 - Left in Finance
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Neighborhood Assistance Act tax credits. Increases from $9 million to $11 million the maximum amount of tax credits that may be issued each year by the Superintendent of Public Instruction for education-related programs and increases from $8 million to $11 million the maximum amount of tax credits that may be issued each year by the Commissioner of the State Department of Social Services for all other programs. The increases are effective beginning with fiscal year 2017. The bill eliminates the requirement that at least 10 percent of the available amount of neighborhood assistance tax credits each year must be reserved for nonprofit organizations that did not receive an allocation of such credits in the preceding year. For credit allocations beginning in fiscal year 2016-2017 from the Department of Social Services, the requirement that at least 50 percent of the persons served by a neighborhood organization be low-income persons does not apply if the neighborhood organization is primarily operated to provide on-site services to individuals with intellectual or developmental disabilities.
Title
Neighborhood Assistance Act; increases maximum amount of tax credits that may be issued.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance with amendment (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance with amendment (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-08 | House | Left in Finance |
2016-02-17 | House | Referred to Committee on Finance |
2016-02-17 | House | Read first time |
2016-02-17 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2016-02-12 | Senate | Printed as engrossed 16101917D-E |
2016-02-12 | Senate | Passed Senate (38-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-12 | Senate | Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-12 | Senate | Passed Senate (37-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-12 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-12 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate as amended SB422E |
2016-02-12 | Senate | Committee amendment agreed to |
2016-02-12 | Senate | Reading of amendment waived |
2016-02-12 | Senate | Read second time |
2016-02-11 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-10 | Senate | Reported from Finance with amendment (14-Y 0-N) |
2016-01-12 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Finance |
2016-01-12 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/16 16101917D |