VA SB42 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 20 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-08 - Left in Commerce and Energy
Pending: House Commerce and Energy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 20 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-08 - Left in Commerce and Energy
Pending: House Commerce and Energy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Health insurance wellness programs; COVID-19 vaccine. Provides that a wellness program provided by a health carrier is provided at the employer's discretion and may include a program that provides a reward or assesses a surcharge to encourage individuals to receive a vaccine for the prevention of COVID-19. Health insurance wellness programs; COVID-19 vaccine. Provides that a wellness program provided by a health carrier is provided at the employer's discretion and may include a program that provides a reward or assesses a surcharge to encourage individuals to receive a vaccine for the prevention of COVID-19.
Title
Health insurance wellness programs; encouraging individuals to receive COVID-19 vaccine.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-01 - House - House: Subcommittee failed to recommend reporting (2-Y 4-N) (Y: 2 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2022-01-21 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (19-Y 17-N) (Y: 19 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-01-21 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (34-Y 0-N) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2022-01-21 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (22-Y 15-N) (Y: 22 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-01-19 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-17 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (12-Y 3-N) (Y: 12 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-21 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (19-Y 17-N) (Y: 19 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-01-21 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (34-Y 0-N) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2022-01-21 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (22-Y 15-N) (Y: 22 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-01-19 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-17 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (12-Y 3-N) (Y: 12 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-08 | House | Left in Commerce and Energy |
2022-03-01 | House | Subcommittee failed to recommend reporting (2-Y 4-N) |
2022-02-28 | House | Assigned sub: Subcommittee #4 |
2022-02-22 | House | Referred to Committee on Commerce and Energy |
2022-02-22 | House | Read first time |
2022-02-22 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2022-01-21 | Senate | Passed Senate (19-Y 17-N) |
2022-01-21 | Senate | Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (34-Y 0-N) |
2022-01-21 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (22-Y 15-N) |
2022-01-20 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB42S1 |
2022-01-20 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 22104611D-S1 |
2022-01-20 | Senate | Read second time |
2022-01-19 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2022-01-17 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 22104611D-S1 |
2022-01-17 | Senate | Reported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (12-Y 3-N) |
2021-12-28 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor |
2021-12-28 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/22 22100410D |