VA SB407 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Enrolled on March 18 2020 - 75% progression
Action: 2020-03-20 - Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

American Revolution 250 Commission; report. Establishes the American Revolution 250 Commission to plan, develop, and perform programs and activities to commemorate the 250th anniversary of the American Revolution, the Revolutionary War, and the independence of the United States. The bill has an expiration date of July 1, 2027.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

American Revolutionary 250 Commission; established, membership, report, sunset provision.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-07 - Senate - Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-05 - House - House: VOTE: Adoption (95-Y 3-N) (Y: 94 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-02 - Senate - Senate: Senate acceded to request (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - Senate - Senate: House substitute rejected by Senate (0-Y 40-N) (Y: 0 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-02-24 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - House - House: Reported from Rules with amendments (17-Y 0-N) (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (36-Y 0-N) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rules with substitute (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-20 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2020
2020-03-20SenateEnrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 20, 2020
2020-03-19HouseSigned by Speaker
2020-03-18SenateSigned by President
2020-03-18SenateBill text as passed Senate and House (SB407ER)
2020-03-18SenateEnrolled
2020-03-07SenateConference report agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
2020-03-05HouseVOTE: Adoption (95-Y 3-N)
2020-03-05HouseConference report agreed to by House (95-Y 3-N)
2020-03-05SenateConference substitute printed 20109623D-S2
2020-03-05 Conference: Amended by conference committee
2020-03-03HouseDelegates: Krizek, Lopez, Cox
2020-03-03HouseConferees appointed by House
2020-03-02SenateSenators: Hashmi, McClellan, Favola
2020-03-02SenateConferees appointed by Senate
2020-03-02SenateSenate acceded to request (40-Y 0-N)
2020-02-27HouseHouse requested conference committee
2020-02-27HouseHouse insisted on substitute
2020-02-26SenateHouse substitute rejected by Senate (0-Y 40-N)
2020-02-24HouseVOTE: Passage (100-Y 0-N)
2020-02-24HousePassed House with substitute (100-Y 0-N)
2020-02-24HouseEngrossed by House - floor substitute SB407H1
2020-02-24HouseSubstitute by Delegate Krizek agreed to 20108718D-H1
2020-02-24HouseCommittee amendments rejected
2020-02-24HouseRead third time
2020-02-21HouseFloor substitute printed 20108718D-H1 (Krizek)
2020-02-21HouseRead second time
2020-02-19HouseReported from Rules with amendments (17-Y 0-N)
2020-02-14HouseReferred to Committee on Rules
2020-02-14HouseRead first time
2020-02-14HousePlaced on Calendar
2020-02-11SenatePassed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
2020-02-11SenateReconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
2020-02-11SenatePassed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
2020-02-11SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2020-02-11SenateEngrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB407S1
2020-02-11SenateCommittee substitute agreed to 20107913D-S1
2020-02-11SenateReading of substitute waived
2020-02-11SenateRead second time
2020-02-10SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (36-Y 0-N)
2020-02-07SenateCommittee substitute printed 20107913D-S1
2020-02-07SenateIncorporates SB714 (McClellan)
2020-02-07SenateReported from Rules with substitute (14-Y 0-N)
2020-01-07SenateReferred to Committee on Rules
2020-01-07SenatePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20103581D

Same As/Similar To

HB1424 (Same As) 2020-03-20 - Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2020

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
222544(n/a)See Bill Text
222549(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+sum+SB407&201+sum+SB407
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+SB407+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+SB407S1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+SB407H1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+SB407S2+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+SB407ER+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+S10V0077+SB0407
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV0457SB0407+SB0407
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV0520SB0407+SB0407
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV0521SB0407+SB0407
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV0522SB0407+SB0407
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV0523SB0407+SB0407
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+H20V0149+SB0407
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+HV1249+SB0407
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV1003SB0407+SB0407
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV1362SB0407+SB0407
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+HV1960+SB0407
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV1770SB0407+SB0407

Bill Comments

feedback