VA HB1424 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-2)
Status: Enrolled on March 18 2020 - 75% progression
Action: 2020-03-20 - Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

American Revolution 250 Commission; report. Establishes the American Revolution 250 Commission to plan, develop, and perform programs and activities to commemorate the 250th anniversary of the American Revolution, the Revolutionary War, and the independence of the United States. The bill has an expiration date of July 1, 2027.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

American Revolutionary 250 Commission; established, membership, report, sunset provision.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-07 - House - House: VOTE: Adoption (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-07 - Senate - Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-05 - Senate - Senate: Senate insisted on substitute (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-04 - House - House: VOTE: REJECTED (0-Y 94-N 1-A) (Y: 0 N: 93 NV: 5 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2020-03-03 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-02 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-28 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rules with substitute (11-Y 0-N) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-07 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations with substitute (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-07 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations with substitute (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-07 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-28 - House - House: Reported from General Laws (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-28 - House - House: Reported from General Laws (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-23 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-23 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-20 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2020
2020-03-20HouseEnrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 20, 2020
2020-03-19HouseSigned by Speaker
2020-03-18SenateSigned by President
2020-03-18HouseBill text as passed House and Senate (HB1424ER)
2020-03-18HouseEnrolled
2020-03-07HouseVOTE: Adoption (99-Y 0-N)
2020-03-07HouseConference report agreed to by House (99-Y 0-N)
2020-03-07SenateConference report agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N)
2020-03-05HouseConference substitute printed 20109751D-H2
2020-03-05 Conference: Amended by conference committee
2020-03-05SenateSenators: Hashmi, McClellan, Favola
2020-03-05SenateConferees appointed by Senate
2020-03-05HouseDelegates: Krizek, Lopez, Cox
2020-03-05HouseConferees appointed by House
2020-03-05HouseHouse acceded to request
2020-03-05SenateSenate requested conference committee
2020-03-05SenateSenate insisted on substitute (39-Y 0-N)
2020-03-04HouseVOTE: REJECTED (0-Y 94-N 1-A)
2020-03-04HouseSenate substitute rejected by House 20109232D-S1 (0-Y 94-N 1-A)
2020-03-04HousePlaced on Calendar
2020-03-03SenatePassed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N)
2020-03-03SenateEngrossed by Senate - committee substitute HB1424S1
2020-03-03SenateCommittee substitute agreed to 20109232D-S1
2020-03-03SenateReading of substitute waived
2020-03-03SenateRead third time
2020-03-02SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
2020-02-28SenateCommittee substitute printed 20109232D-S1
2020-02-28SenateReported from Rules with substitute (11-Y 0-N)
2020-02-12SenateReferred to Committee on Rules
2020-02-12SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2020-02-11HouseVOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N)
2020-02-11HouseRead third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N)
2020-02-10HouseEngrossed by House - committee substitute HB1424H1
2020-02-10HouseCommittee substitute agreed to 20107854D-H1
2020-02-10HouseRead second time
2020-02-09HouseRead first time
2020-02-07HouseReported from Appropriations with substitute (21-Y 0-N)
2020-02-07HouseCommittee substitute printed 20107854D-H1
2020-02-07HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N)
2020-01-29HouseAssigned App. sub: Compensation & General Government
2020-01-28HouseReferred to Committee on Appropriations
2020-01-28HouseReported from General Laws (22-Y 0-N)
2020-01-23HouseSubcommittee recommends referring to Committee on Appropriations
2020-01-23HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N)
2020-01-15HouseAssigned GL sub: Professions/Occupations and Adminstrative Process
2020-01-08HouseReferred to Committee on General Laws
2020-01-08HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20103002D

Same As/Similar To

SB407 (Same As) 2020-03-20 - Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2020
SB407 (Same As) 2020-03-20 - Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2020

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
222544(n/a)See Bill Text
222549(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+sum+HB1424&201+sum+HB1424
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+HB1424+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+HB1424H1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+HB1424S1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+HB1424H2+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+HB1424ER+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+H1101V0009+HB1424
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+H1101V0026+HB1424
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+H11V0141+HB1424
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+H11V0215+HB1424
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+H0202V0053+HB1424
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+H02V0252+HB1424
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+H02V0295+HB1424
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+HV0930+HB1424
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+S10V0109+HB1424
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV1388HB1424+HB1424
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV1435HB1424+HB1424
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+HV1799+HB1424
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV1540HB1424+HB1424
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV1745HB1424+HB1424
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+HV2062+HB1424

Bill Comments

feedback