VA SB405 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0599)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0599)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Health insurance; coverage for prosthetic devices. Requires health insurers, corporations providing health care coverage subscription contracts, health maintenance organizations, and the Commonwealth's Medicaid program to provide coverage for medically necessary prosthetic devices, including myoelectric, biomechanical, or microprocessor-controlled prosthetic devices. The provisions of the bill apply only in the large group markets. The provisions of the bill apply to any policies issued or delivered on and after January 1, 2023.
Title
Health insurance; coverage for prosthetic devices and components.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-11 - House - House: VOTE: Adoption (96-Y 0-N) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-03-11 - Senate - Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-10 - Senate - Senate: Senate acceded to request (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-08 - Senate - Senate: House substitute rejected by Senate (0-Y 39-N) (Y: 0 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2022-03-07 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (95-Y 3-N) (Y: 95 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-03-02 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-01 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-24 - House - House: Reported from Commerce and Energy with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations with amendment (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor with amendments (14-Y 0-N 1-A) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-11 - Senate - Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-10 - Senate - Senate: Senate acceded to request (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-08 - Senate - Senate: House substitute rejected by Senate (0-Y 39-N) (Y: 0 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2022-03-07 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (95-Y 3-N) (Y: 95 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-03-02 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-01 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-24 - House - House: Reported from Commerce and Energy with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations with amendment (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor with amendments (14-Y 0-N 1-A) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-11 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0599) | |
2022-04-11 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 599 (effective 7/1/22) | |
2022-03-22 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2022 | |
2022-03-22 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 22, 2022 |
2022-03-22 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2022-03-21 | Senate | Signed by President |
2022-03-21 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB405ER) |
2022-03-21 | Senate | Enrolled |
2022-03-11 | House | VOTE: Adoption (96-Y 0-N) |
2022-03-11 | House | Conference report agreed to by House (96-Y 0-N) |
2022-03-11 | Senate | Conference report agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2022-03-11 | Conference: Amended by conference committee | |
2022-03-10 | House | Delegates: Byron, Head, Mullin |
2022-03-10 | House | Conferees appointed by House |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Senators: Barker, Spruill, Hackworth |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Conferees appointed by Senate |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Senate acceded to request (40-Y 0-N) |
2022-03-09 | House | House requested conference committee |
2022-03-09 | House | House insisted on substitute |
2022-03-08 | Senate | House substitute rejected by Senate (0-Y 39-N) |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Passed by temporarily |
2022-03-07 | House | VOTE: Passage (95-Y 3-N) |
2022-03-07 | House | Passed House with substitute (95-Y 3-N) |
2022-03-07 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute SB405H1 |
2022-03-07 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 22107042D-H1 |
2022-03-07 | House | Read third time |
2022-03-04 | House | Read second time |
2022-03-02 | House | Reported from Appropriations (21-Y 0-N) |
2022-03-01 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-25 | House | Assigned App. sub: Health & Human Resources |
2022-02-24 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2022-02-24 | House | Committee substitute printed 22107042D-H1 |
2022-02-24 | House | Reported from Commerce and Energy with substitute (22-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-22 | House | Referred to Committee on Commerce and Energy |
2022-02-22 | House | Read first time |
2022-02-22 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2022-02-11 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Printed as engrossed 22102486D-E |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate as amended SB405E |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Committee amendment agreed to |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Reading of amendment waived |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Committee amendments agreed to |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Reading of amendments waived |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Read second time |
2022-02-09 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-08 | Senate | Reported from Finance and Appropriations with amendment (16-Y 0-N) |
2022-01-31 | Senate | Rereferred to Finance and Appropriations |
2022-01-31 | Senate | Reported from Commerce and Labor with amendments (14-Y 0-N 1-A) |
2022-01-11 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor |
2022-01-11 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/22 22102486D |
Same As/Similar To
HB925 (Same As) 2022-04-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0598)
HB925 (Same As) 2022-04-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0598)
HB925 (Same As) 2022-04-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0598)
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
38 | 2 | 3418.15 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
38 | 2 | 3418.15:1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |