VA SB364 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 30 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-30 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0474)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 30 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-30 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0474)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Police-requested vehicular towing. Allows "police-requested towing" to be initiated by uniformed employees of the local police department who are authorized to do so by the chief local law-enforcement officer.
Title
Towing; allows police-requested towing to be initiated by employees authorized by local agency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-02-29 - Senate - Senate: House amendment agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-27 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-23 - House - House: Reported from Transportation with amendment (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-20 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (5-Y 1-N) (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-27 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-25 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Transportation with amendments (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-27 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-23 - House - House: Reported from Transportation with amendment (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-20 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (5-Y 1-N) (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-27 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-25 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Transportation with amendments (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-30 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0474) | |
2012-03-30 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 474 (effective 7/1/12) | |
2012-03-07 | Senate: Signed by President | |
2012-03-05 | House: Signed by Speaker | |
2012-03-05 | Senate: Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB364ER) | |
2012-03-05 | Senate: Enrolled | |
2012-02-29 | Senate: House amendment agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-27 | House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-27 | House: Passed House with amendment BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-27 | House: Engrossed by House as amended | |
2012-02-27 | House: Committee amendment agreed to | |
2012-02-27 | House: Read third time | |
2012-02-24 | House: Read second time | |
2012-02-23 | House: Reported from Transportation with amendment (22-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-20 | House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (5-Y 1-N) | |
2012-02-17 | House: Assigned Transportation sub: #1 | |
2012-02-13 | House: Referred to Committee on Transportation | |
2012-02-13 | House: Read first time | |
2012-02-13 | House: Placed on Calendar | |
2012-01-31 | Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) | |
2012-01-31 | Senate: Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) | |
2012-01-31 | Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (38-Y 0-N) | |
2012-01-30 | Senate: Printed as engrossed 12103785D-E | |
2012-01-30 | Senate: Engrossed by Senate as amended SB364E | |
2012-01-30 | Senate: Committee amendments agreed to | |
2012-01-30 | Senate: Reading of amendments waived | |
2012-01-30 | Senate: Read second time | |
2012-01-27 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) | |
2012-01-25 | Senate: Reported from Transportation with amendments (13-Y 0-N) | |
2012-01-11 | Senate: Referred to Committee on Transportation | |
2012-01-11 | Senate: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/12 12103785D |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
46 | 2 | 1209 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 1211 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 1212 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 1213 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 1215 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |