VA SB363 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB363
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 6 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-06 - Continued to 2021 in Finance and Appropriations (15-Y 0-N)
Pending: Senate Finance and Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 6 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-06 - Continued to 2021 in Finance and Appropriations (15-Y 0-N)
Pending: Senate Finance and Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Education and workforce development; Virginia Works Portal created; report. Creates the Virginia Works Portal to provide one-stop access to information regarding education pathways, career opportunities, and workforce development information available from agencies, institutions, and entities around the Commonwealth. The bill provides that the Portal provide an interactive, user-friendly environment and must be available to the public by July 1, 2021. The bill creates the Virginia Works Board chaired by the Governor's Chief Workforce Development Advisor to oversee the Portal and the Virginia Works Advisory Committee of public and private sector stakeholders to advise the Board. The Virginia Works Board is directed to report annually to the Joint Subcommittee on the Future Competitiveness of Virginia Higher Education and to the Governor and Chairmen of the House Committee on Appropriations and the Senate Committee on Finance.
Title
Virginia Works Portal; created, report.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Continued to 2021 in Finance and Appropriations (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-22 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology with substitute (12-Y 0-N) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-22 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology with substitute (12-Y 0-N) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-06 | Senate | Continued to 2021 in Finance and Appropriations (15-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-22 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 20106348D-S1 |
2020-01-22 | Senate | Rereferred to Finance and Appropriations |
2020-01-22 | Senate | Reported from General Laws and Technology with substitute (12-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-06 | Senate | Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology |
2020-01-06 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20101467D |
Same As/Similar To
SB363 (Carry Over) 2020-02-06 - Continued to 2021 in Finance and Appropriations (15-Y 0-N)