VA SB343 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 6 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-06 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0656)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 6 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-06 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0656)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Virginia Residential Property Disclosure Act; required disclosures for buyer to beware; impounding structures or dams. Directs the Real Estate Board to include in the residential property disclosure statement provided on its website a disclosure relating to the condition or regulatory status of any impounding structure or dam on the owner's property or under the ownership of a common interest community that the owner of the property is required to join. As introduced, this bill was a recommendation of the Virginia Housing Commission.
Title
Dams; disclosure statements.
Sponsors
Sen. Mamie Locke [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-02-25 - Senate - Senate: House substitute agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-21 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-18 - House - House: Reported from General Laws with substitute (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-21 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-17 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-15 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-21 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-18 - House - House: Reported from General Laws with substitute (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-21 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-17 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-15 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-06 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0656) | |
2020-04-06 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 656 (effective 7/1/20) | |
2020-03-12 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2020 | |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 12, 2020 |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Signed by President |
2020-03-02 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB343ER) |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Enrolled |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Title replaced 20108616D-H1 |
2020-02-25 | Senate | House substitute agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-21 | House | VOTE: Block Vote Passage (98-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-21 | House | Passed House with substitute BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-21 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute SB343H1 |
2020-02-21 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 20108616D-H1 |
2020-02-21 | House | Read third time |
2020-02-20 | House | Read second time |
2020-02-18 | House | Committee substitute printed 20108616D-H1 |
2020-02-18 | House | Reported from General Laws with substitute (21-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-18 | House | Referred to Committee on General Laws |
2020-02-18 | House | Read first time |
2020-02-18 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2020-01-21 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-20 | Senate | Read second time and engrossed |
2020-01-17 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-15 | Senate | Reported from General Laws and Technology (14-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-06 | Senate | Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology |
2020-01-06 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20103379D |
Same As/Similar To
HB1569 (Same As) 2020-04-06 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0655)