VA SB343 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 12 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-01 - House: Continued to 2011 in Finance by voice vote
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-01 - House: Continued to 2011 in Finance by voice vote
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Fuels taxes; annually adjusted. Adjusts fuels taxes each year on April 1 by the percentage increase in the Corporate Average Fuel Economy (sales volume weighted), Total Fleet (the CAFE) for the immediately preceding calendar year over the CAFE for calendar year 2009. The first adjustment would occur on April 1, 2011.
Title
Fuels taxes; annually adjusted.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (31-Y 9-N) (Y: 31 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-01 | House: Continued to 2011 in Finance by voice vote | |
2010-02-24 | House: Subcommittee recommends continuing to 2011 by voice vote | |
2010-02-22 | House: Assigned Finance sub: #2 | |
2010-02-22 | House: Referred to Committee on Finance | |
2010-02-22 | House: Read first time | |
2010-02-22 | House: Placed on Calendar | |
2010-02-19 | Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (31-Y 9-N) | |
2010-02-18 | Senate: Read second time and engrossed | |
2010-02-17 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) | |
2010-02-16 | Senate: Reported from Finance (15-Y 0-N) | |
2010-01-12 | Senate: Referred to Committee on Finance | |
2010-01-12 | Senate: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/10 10101494D |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
58 | 1 | 2217 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
58 | 1 | 2249 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
58 | 1 | 2701 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
58 | 1 | 2706 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |