VA SB341 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 4 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-04 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0163)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 4 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-04 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0163)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Construction management contracts; use by local public bodies. Removes the provision limiting the use of construction management contracts by local public bodies to projects with a cost expected to exceed $10 million and provides that construction management may be utilized on projects where the project cost is expected to be less than the project threshold established in the procedures adopted by the Secretary of Administration for using construction management contracts.
Title
Construction management contracts; use by local public bodies.
Sponsors
Sen. Mamie Locke [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-02-20 - Senate - Senate: House amendments agreed to by Senate (33-Y 7-N) (Y: 33 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-18 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (96-Y 4-N) (Y: 96 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-13 - House - House: Reported from General Laws with amendments (21-Y 1-N) (Y: 21 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-28 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (36-Y 4-N) (Y: 36 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-24 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-22 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology with substitute (14-Y 1-N) (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-18 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (96-Y 4-N) (Y: 96 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-13 - House - House: Reported from General Laws with amendments (21-Y 1-N) (Y: 21 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-28 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (36-Y 4-N) (Y: 36 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-24 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-22 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology with substitute (14-Y 1-N) (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-04 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0163) | |
2020-03-04 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 163 (effective 7/1/20) | |
2020-02-28 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., March 6, 2020 | |
2020-02-28 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on February 28, 2020 |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Signed by President |
2020-02-24 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB341ER) |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Enrolled |
2020-02-20 | Senate | House amendments agreed to by Senate (33-Y 7-N) |
2020-02-18 | House | VOTE: Passage (96-Y 4-N) |
2020-02-18 | House | Passed House with amendments (96-Y 4-N) |
2020-02-18 | House | Engrossed by House as amended |
2020-02-18 | House | Committee amendments agreed to |
2020-02-18 | House | Read third time |
2020-02-17 | House | Read second time |
2020-02-13 | House | Reported from General Laws with amendments (21-Y 1-N) |
2020-02-03 | House | Referred to Committee on General Laws |
2020-02-03 | House | Read first time |
2020-02-03 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2020-01-28 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (36-Y 4-N) |
2020-01-27 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB341S1 |
2020-01-27 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 20105651D-S1 |
2020-01-27 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2020-01-27 | Senate | Read second time |
2020-01-24 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-22 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 20105651D-S1 |
2020-01-22 | Senate | Reported from General Laws and Technology with substitute (14-Y 1-N) |
2020-01-06 | Senate | Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology |
2020-01-06 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20102415D |
Same As/Similar To
HB890 (Same As) 2020-03-04 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0162)