VA SB341 | 2008 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2008 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2008-01-28 - Senate: Incorporated by Courts of Justice (SB246-Howell) (13-Y 0-N)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2008 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2008-01-28 - Senate: Incorporated by Courts of Justice (SB246-Howell) (13-Y 0-N)
Summary
Temporary detention order; hearing. Provides that a hearing on an involuntary temporary detention order shall be held no sooner than 24 hours and no later than 72 hours from the time of the issuance of the order. Currently, such hearings are to be conducted within 48 hours from the time of the issuance of the order. This bill has been incorporated into
Title
Temporary detention order; time for hearing.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2008-01-28 | Senate: Incorporated by Courts of Justice (SB246-Howell) (13-Y 0-N) | |
2008-01-21 | Senate: Assigned Courts sub: Special on Proposed Mental Health Legislation | |
2008-01-08 | Senate: Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice | |
2008-01-08 | Senate: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/08 080234216 |
Same As/Similar To
SB246 (Similar To) 2008-04-23 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0870)
Subjects
Courts Not of Record
Criminal Procedure
Mental Health, Mental Retardation, and Substance Abuse Services
Criminal Procedure
Mental Health, Mental Retardation, and Substance Abuse Services
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?081+sum+SB341 |