VA SB330 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 30 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-30 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0567)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 30 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-30 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0567)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
CBD and THC-A oil. Adds cannabidiol oil (CBD oil) or THC-A oil to the list of covered substances the dispensing of which must be reported to the Prescription Monitoring Program. The bill requires a practitioner, prior to issuing a written certification for CBD oil or THC-A oil to a patient, to request information from the Director of the Department of Health Professions for the purpose of determining what other covered substances have been dispensed to the patient.
Title
THC-A oil; dispensing, tetrahydrocannabinol levels.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-05 - Senate - Senate: House substitute agreed to by Senate (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-02 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (96-Y 0-N) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-27 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with substitute (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-20 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (10-Y 0-N) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-17 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-12 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-11 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with amendment (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-02 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (96-Y 0-N) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-27 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with substitute (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-20 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (10-Y 0-N) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-17 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-12 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-11 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with amendment (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-30 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0567) | |
2018-03-30 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 567 (effective 3/30/18) | |
2018-03-15 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, April 9, 2018 | |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 15, 2018 |
2018-03-09 | Senate | Signed by President |
2018-03-07 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2018-03-07 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB330ER) |
2018-03-07 | Senate | Enrolled |
2018-03-05 | Senate | Title replaced 18107733D-H1 |
2018-03-05 | Senate | Emergency clause added |
2018-03-05 | Senate | House substitute agreed to by Senate (38-Y 0-N) |
2018-03-02 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (96-Y 0-N) |
2018-03-02 | House | Passed House with substitute BLOCK VOTE (96-Y 0-N) |
2018-03-02 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute SB330H1 |
2018-03-02 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 18107733D-H1 |
2018-03-02 | House | Read third time |
2018-03-01 | House | Read second time |
2018-02-27 | House | Committee substitute printed 18107733D-H1 |
2018-02-27 | House | Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with substitute (21-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-20 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (10-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-16 | House | Assigned HWI sub: Subcommittee #2 |
2018-01-23 | House | Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions |
2018-01-23 | House | Read first time |
2018-01-23 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2018-01-17 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2018-01-16 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - floor substitute SB330S1 |
2018-01-16 | Senate | Substitute by Senator Dunnavant agreed to 18105163D-S1 |
2018-01-16 | Senate | Floor substitute printed 18105163D-S1 (Dunnavant) |
2018-01-16 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2018-01-16 | Senate | Committee amendment rejected |
2018-01-16 | Senate | Reading of amendment waived |
2018-01-16 | Senate | Read second time |
2018-01-15 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2018-01-15 | Senate | Read second time |
2018-01-12 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2018-01-11 | Senate | Reported from Education and Health with amendment (15-Y 0-N) |
2018-01-08 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education and Health |
2018-01-08 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18103139D |