VA SB330 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-12-02 - Left in Finance
Pending: Senate Finance and Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-12-02 - Left in Finance
Pending: Senate Finance and Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
In-state tuition; members of the Virginia National Guard. Provides that any member of the Virginia National Guard residing in Virginia shall be eligible for in-state tuition at a public institution of higher education.
Title
Tuition, in-state; eligibility of members of Virginia National Guard.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Continued to 2017 in Finance (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-28 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-28 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-12-02 | Senate | Left in Finance |
2016-02-09 | Senate | Continued to 2017 in Finance (15-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-09 | Senate | Committee substitute printed to Web only 16105361D-S1 |
2016-01-28 | Senate | Rereferred to Finance |
2016-01-28 | Senate | Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) |
2016-01-25 | Senate | Assigned Education sub: Higher Education |
2016-01-08 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education and Health |
2016-01-08 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/16 16101623D |