VA SB317 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on January 27 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-03-10 - House: Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 27 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-03-10 - House: Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Drug Treatment Courts. Provides for the establishment of drug treatment courts in the City of Danville and the Counties of Buchanan, Dickenson, Goochland, Montgomery, Russell, and Washington, and a drug treatment court in the County of Wise that shall serve the Counties of Lee, Scott, and Wise.
Title
Drug treatment courts; established in Buchanan, Dickenson, Goochland, Montgomery & Russell Counties.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-01-30 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-26 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-25 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance (12-Y 0-N) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-18 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with amendments (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-26 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-25 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance (12-Y 0-N) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-18 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with amendments (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-10 | House: Left in Courts of Justice | |
2012-02-29 | House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table by voice vote | |
2012-02-16 | House: Assigned Courts sub: #1 Criminal | |
2012-02-13 | House: Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice | |
2012-02-13 | House: Read first time | |
2012-02-13 | House: Placed on Calendar | |
2012-01-30 | Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) | |
2012-01-27 | Senate: Printed as engrossed 12100951D-E | |
2012-01-27 | Senate: Engrossed by Senate as amended SB317E | |
2012-01-27 | Senate: Committee amendments agreed to | |
2012-01-27 | Senate: Reading of amendments waived | |
2012-01-27 | Senate: Read second time | |
2012-01-26 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) | |
2012-01-25 | Senate: Reported from Finance (12-Y 0-N) | |
2012-01-18 | Senate: Rereferred to Finance | |
2012-01-18 | Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with amendments (15-Y 0-N) | |
2012-01-10 | Senate: Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice | |
2012-01-10 | Senate: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/12 12100951D |
Subjects
Buchanan County
Crimes and Offenses Generally
Danville, City of
Goochland County
Montgomery County
Narcotics and Drugs
Russell County
Washington County
Crimes and Offenses Generally
Danville, City of
Goochland County
Montgomery County
Narcotics and Drugs
Russell County
Washington County