VA SB30 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on December 16 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-04 - Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 16 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-04 - Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Budget Bill. Appropriations of the Budget submitted by the Governor of Virginia providing a portion of revenues for the two years ending respectively on the thirtieth day of June, 2015, and the thirtieth day of June, 2016.
Title
Budget Bill.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (23-Y 17-N) (Y: 23 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 2-N) (Y: 38 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Contested committee amendments agreed to (P.110 Item 278#2s) (23-Y 17-N) (Y: 23 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Pending question ordered (32-Y 8-N) (Y: 32 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Contested committee amendment agreed to (P.44 Item 136#11s) (27-Y 13-N) (Y: 27 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Motion for Special and Continuing Order (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance with amendments (14-Y 0-N 3-A) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 2-N) (Y: 38 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Contested committee amendments agreed to (P.110 Item 278#2s) (23-Y 17-N) (Y: 23 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Pending question ordered (32-Y 8-N) (Y: 32 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Contested committee amendment agreed to (P.44 Item 136#11s) (27-Y 13-N) (Y: 27 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Motion for Special and Continuing Order (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance with amendments (14-Y 0-N 3-A) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-04 | House | Left in Appropriations |
2014-02-24 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2014-02-24 | House | Read first time |
2014-02-24 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2014-02-20 | Senate | Passed Senate (23-Y 17-N) |
2014-02-20 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 2-N) |
2014-02-20 | Senate | Budget floor amendments agreed to available |
2014-02-20 | Senate | Amendment by Senator Miller agreed to |
2014-02-20 | Senate | Reading of amendment waived |
2014-02-20 | Senate | Amendment by Senator Marsh ruled out of order |
2014-02-20 | Senate | Contested committee amendment agreed to (P.196 Item C-11#1s) |
2014-02-20 | Senate | Contested committee amendment agreed to (P.155 Item 357#2s) |
2014-02-20 | Senate | (pg.215 Item 4-14.00#2s) and (pg.216 Item 4-14.00#3s) |
2014-02-20 | Senate | (pg.135 Item 301#16s), (pg.209 Item 4-5.03#1s), (pg.212 Item 4-14.00#1s) |
2014-02-20 | Senate | Contested committee amendments agreed to (P.110 Item 278#2s) (23-Y 17-N) |
2014-02-20 | Senate | Pending question ordered (32-Y 8-N) |
2014-02-20 | Senate | Contested committee amendment agreed to (P.83 Item 204#6s) |
2014-02-20 | Senate | Contested committee amendment agreed to (P.49 Item 138#1s) |
2014-02-20 | Senate | Contested committee amendment agreed to (P.44 Item 136#11s) (27-Y 13-N) |
2014-02-20 | Senate | Contested committee amendment agreed to (P.38 Item 135#9s) |
2014-02-20 | Senate | Contested committee amendment agreed to (P.35 Item 135#5s) |
2014-02-20 | Senate | Contested committee amendment agreed to (P.32 Item 130#1s) |
2014-02-20 | Senate | Contested committee amendment agreed to (P.24 Item 101#1s) |
2014-02-20 | Senate | Contested committee amendment agreed to (P.21 Item 80#1s) |
2014-02-20 | Senate | Contested committee amendment agreed to (P.6 Item 37#1s) |
2014-02-20 | Senate | Uncontested Committee amendments agreed to |
2014-02-20 | Senate | Passed by temporarily |
2014-02-20 | Senate | Read second time |
2014-02-19 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2014-02-19 | Senate | Motion for Special and Continuing Order (39-Y 0-N) |
2014-02-18 | Senate | Read first time |
2014-02-18 | Senate | Budget amendments available |
2014-02-16 | Senate | Reported from Finance with amendments (14-Y 0-N 3-A) |
2013-12-16 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Finance |
2013-12-16 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/14 14102006D |