VA SB294 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0348)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0348)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Fee for solid waste disposal; Bath County. Adds Bath County to the list of counties that may by ordinance, and after a public hearing, levy a fee for the management of solid waste not to exceed the actual cost incurred by the county in removing and disposing of solid waste. The bill also grants Bath County various powers with regard to collection of the fee, including to levy penalties and interest for late payment and unpaid fees, to require payment of the fee prior to approval of certain land use applications, and to provide discounts to the standard fee rates for certain older and disabled persons.
Title
Bath County; fee for solid waste disposal.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-03 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (92-Y 8-N) (Y: 92 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-25 - House - House: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-25 - House - House: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-20 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (29-Y 11-N) (Y: 29 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-18 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-01-17 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Local Government (12-Y 3-N) (Y: 12 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-25 - House - House: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-25 - House - House: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-20 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (29-Y 11-N) (Y: 29 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-18 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-01-17 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Local Government (12-Y 3-N) (Y: 12 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-11 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0348) | |
2022-04-11 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 348 (effective 7/1/22) | |
2022-03-22 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2022 | |
2022-03-22 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 22, 2022 |
2022-03-08 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Signed by President |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB294ER) |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Enrolled |
2022-03-03 | House | VOTE: Passage (92-Y 8-N) |
2022-03-03 | House | Passed House (92-Y 8-N) |
2022-03-03 | House | Read third time |
2022-03-02 | House | Passed by for the day |
2022-03-01 | House | Read second time |
2022-02-25 | House | Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns (22-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-22 | House | Referred to Committee on Counties, Cities and Towns |
2022-02-22 | House | Read first time |
2022-02-22 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2022-01-20 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (29-Y 11-N) |
2022-01-19 | Senate | Read second time and engrossed |
2022-01-18 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) |
2022-01-17 | Senate | Reported from Local Government (12-Y 3-N) |
2022-01-11 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Local Government |
2022-01-11 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/22 22100025D |
Same As/Similar To
HB32 (Same As) 2022-04-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0347)
HB32 (Same As) 2022-04-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0347)
HB32 (Same As) 2022-04-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0347)