VA SB291 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 8 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-08 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0248)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 8 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-08 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0248)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Service of process; investigator employed by an attorney for the Commonwealth or Indigent Defense Commission. Provides that all investigators employed by an attorney for the Commonwealth or by the Indigent Defense Commission while engaged in the performance of their official duties when serving witness subpoenas shall not be considered a party or otherwise interested in the subject matter in controversy and, thus, are authorized to serve process to such witnesses.
Title
Service of process; investigator employed by an attorney for the Commonwealth, etc.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-04 - Senate - Senate: House substitute agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-02 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-25 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (20-Y 0-N) (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-23 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-25 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-21 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-01-19 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Judiciary (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-02 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-25 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (20-Y 0-N) (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-23 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-25 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-21 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-01-19 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Judiciary (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-08 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0248) | |
2022-04-08 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 248 (effective 7/1/22) | |
2022-03-22 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2022 | |
2022-03-22 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 22, 2022 |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Signed by President |
2022-03-09 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB291ER) |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Enrolled |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Title replaced 22106908D-H1 |
2022-03-04 | Senate | House substitute agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N) |
2022-03-02 | House | VOTE: Passage (99-Y 0-N) |
2022-03-02 | House | Passed House with substitute (99-Y 0-N) |
2022-03-02 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute SB291H1 |
2022-03-02 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 22106908D-H1 |
2022-03-02 | House | Read third time |
2022-03-01 | House | Passed by for the day |
2022-02-28 | House | Read second time |
2022-02-25 | House | Committee substitute printed 22106908D-H1 |
2022-02-25 | House | Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (20-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-23 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-22 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Subcommittee #2 |
2022-02-21 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2022-02-21 | House | Read first time |
2022-02-21 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2022-01-25 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2022-01-24 | Senate | Read second time and engrossed |
2022-01-21 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) |
2022-01-19 | Senate | Reported from Judiciary (15-Y 0-N) |
2022-01-11 | Senate | Referred to Committee on the Judiciary |
2022-01-11 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/22 22100342D |
Same As/Similar To
HB682 (Same As) 2022-04-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0684)
HB682 (Same As) 2022-04-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0684)
HB682 (Same As) 2022-04-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0684)
Subjects
Civil Remedies and Procedure
Commissions Boards and Institutions Generally
Commonwealth's Attorneys
Service of Process
Subpoenas
Witnesses
Commissions Boards and Institutions Generally
Commonwealth's Attorneys
Service of Process
Subpoenas
Witnesses