VA HB682 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0684)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0684)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Service of process; investigator employed by an attorney for the Commonwealth or Indigent Defense Commission. Provides that all investigators employed by an attorney for the Commonwealth or by the Indigent Defense Commission while engaged in the performance of their official duties when serving witness subpoenas shall not be considered a party or otherwise interested in the subject matter in controversy and, thus, are authorized to serve process to such witnesses.
Title
Service of process; investigator employed by an attorney for the Commonwealth, etc.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-10 - House - House: VOTE: Adoption (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-09 - Senate - Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-03-01 - Senate - Senate: Senate insisted on substitute (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-25 - House - House: VOTE: Rejected (0-Y 99-N) (Y: 0 N: 99 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2022-02-23 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Judiciary with substitute (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-15 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-11 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (18-Y 0-N) (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-07 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-09 - Senate - Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-03-01 - Senate - Senate: Senate insisted on substitute (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-25 - House - House: VOTE: Rejected (0-Y 99-N) (Y: 0 N: 99 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2022-02-23 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Judiciary with substitute (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-15 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-11 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (18-Y 0-N) (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-07 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-11 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0684) | |
2022-04-11 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 684 (effective 7/1/22) | |
2022-03-22 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2022 | |
2022-03-22 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 22, 2022 |
2022-03-22 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2022-03-21 | Senate | Signed by President |
2022-03-21 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB682ER) |
2022-03-21 | House | Enrolled |
2022-03-10 | House | VOTE: Adoption (100-Y 0-N) |
2022-03-10 | House | Conference report agreed to by House (100-Y 0-N) |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Conference report agreed to by Senate (37-Y 0-N) |
2022-03-09 | Conference: Amended by conference committee | |
2022-03-07 | House | Delegates: Hope, Bell, Adams, L.R. |
2022-03-07 | House | Conferees appointed by House |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Senators: Deeds, Boysko, Obenshain |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Conferees appointed by Senate |
2022-03-02 | House | House acceded to request |
2022-03-01 | Senate | Senate requested conference committee |
2022-03-01 | Senate | Senate insisted on substitute (40-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-25 | House | VOTE: Rejected (0-Y 99-N) |
2022-02-25 | House | Senate substitute rejected by House 22106768D-S1 (0-Y 99-N) |
2022-02-23 | Senate | Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-23 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute HB682S1 |
2022-02-23 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 22106768D-S1 |
2022-02-23 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2022-02-23 | Senate | Read third time |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-21 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 22106768D-S1 |
2022-02-21 | Senate | Reported from Judiciary with substitute (14-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Referred to Committee on the Judiciary |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2022-02-15 | House | VOTE: Block Vote Passage (100-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-15 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-14 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB682H1 |
2022-02-14 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 22106250D-H1 |
2022-02-14 | House | Read second time |
2022-02-13 | House | Read first time |
2022-02-11 | House | Committee substitute printed 22106250D-H1 |
2022-02-11 | House | Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (18-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-07 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (7-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-03 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Subcommittee #3 |
2022-01-11 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2022-01-11 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/22 22101921D |
Same As/Similar To
SB291 (Same As) 2022-04-08 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0248)
SB291 (Same As) 2022-04-08 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0248)
SB291 (Same As) 2022-04-08 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0248)
Subjects
Civil Remedies and Procedure
Commissions Boards and Institutions Generally
Commonwealth's Attorneys
Service of Process
Subpoenas
Witnesses
Commissions Boards and Institutions Generally
Commonwealth's Attorneys
Service of Process
Subpoenas
Witnesses