VA SB270 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 4 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-08 - Left in General Laws
Pending: House General Laws Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 4 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-08 - Left in General Laws
Pending: House General Laws Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Administration of government; language access equity; report. Establishes the Interagency Language Access Working Group in the Office of the Director of Diversity, Equity, and Inclusion with the following membership: the Director of Diversity, Equity, and Inclusion, the Director of the Office of the Children's Ombudsman, the Governor's Secretaries, and six nonlegislative citizen members representing organizations that represent individuals with language access needs. The Working Group is established for the purpose of maximizing state policies, resources, technical assistance, and procurement practices to further language access and equity in the Commonwealth and its state government agencies. The bill also requires each state agency to designate a language access coordinator who will be responsible for the agency's annual language access report, the requirements of which are set out in the bill. The Secretary of Administration is directed to establish criteria for state agencies to procure language interpretation and translation services and to establish a policy for compensating multilingual state employees who are required as part of their job to provide interpretation, translation, or other bilingual skills at least once a month.
Title
Administration of government; language access equity, report.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-24 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (5-Y 3-N) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (21-Y 19-N) (Y: 21 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations (11-Y 4-N) (Y: 11 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-19 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology (8-Y 7-N) (Y: 8 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (21-Y 19-N) (Y: 21 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations (11-Y 4-N) (Y: 11 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-19 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology (8-Y 7-N) (Y: 8 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-08 | House | Left in General Laws |
2022-02-24 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (5-Y 3-N) |
2022-02-23 | House | Assigned GL sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2022-02-21 | House | Referred to Committee on General Laws |
2022-02-21 | House | Read first time |
2022-02-21 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2022-02-07 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (21-Y 19-N) |
2022-02-04 | Senate | Read second time and engrossed |
2022-02-03 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-02 | Senate | Reported from Finance and Appropriations (11-Y 4-N) |
2022-01-19 | Senate | Rereferred to Finance and Appropriations |
2022-01-19 | Senate | Reported from General Laws and Technology (8-Y 7-N) |
2022-01-11 | Senate | Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology |
2022-01-11 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/22 22104256D |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
2 | 2 | 203.2:6 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 2 | 435.13 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 2 | 604.3 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |