VA SB268 | 2008 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 27 2008 - 100% progression
Action: 2008-04-14 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0693)

Summary

Affordable Dwelling Unit ordinance; permitting certain densities in the comprehensive plan. Authorizes the City of Charlottesville to provide in its comprehensive plan for the physical development within the city for densities of development ranging between a floor area ratio (FAR) of 1.0 (1.0 FAR) and a floor area ratio of 10.0 (10.0 FAR) or greater in some or all parts of the city. The bill authorizes the City of Charlottesville to establish affordable housing contributions from developers as a condition of the governing body's approval of a special exception application for residential or certain mixed-use projects with a density equal to or greater than 1.0 FAR. Under the bill, the provisions of the ordinance would allow the developer to provide on-site Affordable Dwelling Units, off-site Affordable Dwelling Units, or a cash contribution to the city's affordable housing fund in lieu of providing the units. This bill is identical to

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Affordable housing; permitting certain densities in plan in City of Charlottesville.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2008-04-14 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0693)
2008-03-27 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 693 (effective 7/1/08)
2008-03-11 Senate: Signed by President
2008-03-08 House: Signed by Speaker
2008-03-08 Senate: Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB268ER)
2008-03-08 Senate: Enrolled
2008-03-06 Senate: House substitute agreed to by Senate (36-Y 0-N)
2008-03-06 House: VOTE: --- PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N)
2008-03-06 House: Passed House with substitute (97-Y 0-N)
2008-03-06 House: Engrossed by House - committee substitute SB268H1
2008-03-06 House: Committee substitute agreed to 083052220-H1
2008-03-06 House: Read third time
2008-03-05 House: Passed by for the day
2008-03-04 House: Passed by for the day
2008-03-03 House: Read second time
2008-02-29 House: Committee substitute printed 083052220-H1
2008-02-29 House: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns with substitute (21-Y 0-N)
2008-02-13 House: Referred to Committee on Counties, Cities and Towns
2008-02-13 House: Read first time
2008-02-13 House: Placed on Calendar
2008-02-08 Senate: Communicated to House
2008-02-08 Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
2008-02-08 Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2008-02-08 Senate: Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB268S1
2008-02-08 Senate: Committee substitute agreed to 082061220-S1
2008-02-08 Senate: Reading of substitute waived
2008-02-08 Senate: Read second time
2008-02-07 Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
2008-02-06 Senate: Committee substitute printed 082061220-S1
2008-02-05 Senate: Reported from Local Government with substitute (14-Y 0-N)
2008-01-08 Senate: Referred to Committee on Local Government
2008-01-08 Senate: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/08 088172220

Same As/Similar To

HB883 (Same As) 2008-03-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0311)

Subjects


Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback