VA HB883 | 2008 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 4 2008 - 100% progression
Action: 2008-03-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0311)

Summary

Affordable Dwelling Unit ordinance; permitting certain densities in the comprehensive plan. Authorizes the City of Charlottesville to provide in its comprehensive plan for the physical development within the city for densities of development ranging between a floor area ratio (FAR) of 1.0 (1.0 FAR) and a floor area ratio of 10.0 (10.0 FAR) or greater in some or all parts of the city. The bill authorizes the City of Charlottesville to establish affordable housing contributions from developers as a condition of the governing body's approval of a special exception application for residential, commercial, or mixed-use projects with a density equal to or greater than 1.0 FAR. Under the bill, the provisions of the ordinance would allow the developer to provide on-site Affordable Dwelling Units, off-site Affordable Dwelling Units, or a cash contribution to the city's affordable housing fund in lieu of providing the units. This bill is identical to

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Affordable housing; permitting certain densities in plan in City of Charlottesville.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2008-03-11 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0311)
2008-03-04 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 311 (effective 7/1/08)
2008-02-28 Senate: Signed by President
2008-02-26 House: Signed by Speaker
2008-02-25 House: Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB883ER)
2008-02-25 House: Enrolled
2008-02-22 Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
2008-02-22 Senate: Read third time
2008-02-21 Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2008-02-19 Senate: Reported from Local Government (15-Y 0-N)
2008-02-13 Senate: Referred to Committee on Local Government
2008-02-13 Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed
2008-02-12 House: Communicated to Senate
2008-02-12 House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
2008-02-12 House: Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N)
2008-02-11 House: Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB883H1
2008-02-11 House: Committee substitute agreed to 082067752-H1
2008-02-11 House: Read second time
2008-02-09 House: Read first time
2008-02-08 House: Committee substitute printed 082067752-H1
2008-02-08 House: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns with substitute (22-Y 0-N)
2008-01-08 House: Referred to Committee on Counties, Cities and Towns
2008-01-08 House: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/08 088266752

Same As/Similar To

SB268 (Same As) 2010-01-26 - Senate: Failed to report (defeated) in Local Government (6-Y 9-N)

Subjects


Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback