VA SB234 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 12 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-14 - House: Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 12 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-14 - House: Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Hazardous waste permit fees. Authorizes the Virginia Waste Management Board to collect fees from any person operating or proposing to operate a hazardous waste facility, or transporting hazardous waste. The fees collected would be in an amount that ensures that general funds are not required to cover the direct costs related to the issuance and reissuance of permits.
Title
Hazardous waste permit fees; Waste Management Board authorized to collect fees.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-02-24 - House - House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 1-N) (Y: 39 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance with substitute (14-Y 1-N) (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-01-25 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources with amendment (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 1-N) (Y: 39 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance with substitute (14-Y 1-N) (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-01-25 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources with amendment (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-14 | House: Left in Appropriations | |
2010-03-01 | House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table by voice vote | |
2010-03-01 | House: Assigned App. sub: Economic Development, Agriculture and Natural Resources | |
2010-02-24 | House: Referred to Committee on Appropriations | |
2010-02-24 | House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources (22-Y 0-N) | |
2010-02-17 | House: Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources | |
2010-02-17 | House: Read first time | |
2010-02-17 | House: Placed on Calendar | |
2010-02-15 | Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 1-N) | |
2010-02-12 | Senate: Engrossed by Senate - floor substitute SB234S2 | |
2010-02-12 | Senate: Substitute by Senator Watkins agreed to 10105303D-S2 | |
2010-02-12 | Senate: Reading of substitute waived | |
2010-02-12 | Senate: Floor substitute printed 10105303D-S2 (Watkins) | |
2010-02-12 | Senate: Committee substitute rejected 10105153D-S1 | |
2010-02-12 | Senate: Reading of substitute waived | |
2010-02-12 | Senate: Committee amendment rejected | |
2010-02-12 | Senate: Reading of amendment waived | |
2010-02-12 | Senate: Read second time | |
2010-02-11 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) | |
2010-02-10 | Senate: Committee substitute printed 10105153D-S1 | |
2010-02-10 | Senate: Reported from Finance with substitute (14-Y 1-N) | |
2010-01-25 | Senate: Rereferred to Finance | |
2010-01-25 | Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources with amendment (14-Y 0-N) | |
2010-01-12 | Senate: Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources | |
2010-01-12 | Senate: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/10 10101248D |