VA SB224 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 1 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-14 - Senate: Failed to pass in Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 1 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-14 - Senate: Failed to pass in Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Notification of breach of medical information. Requires notification to residents of the Commonwealth if their unredacted or unencrypted medical information or insurance information is the subject of a database breach. The notification required by this section would apply only to entities not subject to federal medical information database breach notification regulations. This bill has a delayed effective date of January 1, 2011.
Title
Medical information; notification to residents if their information is subject of database breach.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-03-11 - Senate - Senate: Senate acceded to request (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-09 - Senate - Senate: House substitute rejected by Senate (4-Y 35-N) (Y: 4 N: 35 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2010-03-05 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-05 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-03 - House - House: Reported from Science and Technology with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-01-28 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with amendments (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-09 - Senate - Senate: House substitute rejected by Senate (4-Y 35-N) (Y: 4 N: 35 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2010-03-05 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-05 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-03 - House - House: Reported from Science and Technology with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-01-28 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with amendments (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-14 | Senate: Failed to pass in Senate | |
2010-03-14 | Senate: No further action taken | |
2010-03-11 | House: Delegates: Byron, Greason, Miller, P.J. | |
2010-03-11 | House: Conferees appointed by House | |
2010-03-11 | Senate: Senators: Barker, Northam, Martin | |
2010-03-11 | Senate: Conferees appointed by Senate | |
2010-03-11 | Senate: Senate acceded to request (40-Y 0-N) | |
2010-03-10 | House: House requested conference committee | |
2010-03-10 | House: House insisted on substitute | |
2010-03-09 | Senate: House substitute rejected by Senate (4-Y 35-N) | |
2010-03-05 | House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) | |
2010-03-05 | House: Passed House with substitute BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) | |
2010-03-05 | House: Reconsideration of House passage agreed to by House | |
2010-03-05 | House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) | |
2010-03-05 | House: Passed House with substitute BLOCK VOTE (97-Y 0-N) | |
2010-03-05 | House: Engrossed by House - committee substitute SB224H1 | |
2010-03-05 | House: Committee substitute agreed to 10105795D-H1 | |
2010-03-05 | House: Read third time | |
2010-03-04 | House: Read second time | |
2010-03-03 | House: Committee substitute printed 10105795D-H1 | |
2010-03-03 | House: Reported from Science and Technology with substitute (22-Y 0-N) | |
2010-02-18 | House: Referred to Committee on Science and Technology | |
2010-02-18 | House: Referred from Health, Welfare and Institutions by voice vote | |
2010-02-08 | House: Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions | |
2010-02-08 | House: Read first time | |
2010-02-08 | House: Placed on Calendar | |
2010-02-02 | Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) | |
2010-02-01 | Senate: Printed as engrossed 10102011D-E | |
2010-02-01 | Senate: Engrossed by Senate as amended SB224E | |
2010-02-01 | Senate: Committee amendments agreed to | |
2010-02-01 | Senate: Reading of amendments waived | |
2010-02-01 | Senate: Read second time | |
2010-01-29 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) | |
2010-01-28 | Senate: Reported from Education and Health with amendments (15-Y 0-N) | |
2010-01-14 | Senate: Assigned Education sub: Health Care | |
2010-01-12 | Senate: Referred to Committee on Education and Health | |
2010-01-12 | Senate: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/10 10102011D |