VA SB215 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 9 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-08 - Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 9 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-08 - Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Juvenile facilities; room segregation; regulations. Requires the Board of Juvenile Justice to promulgate regulations on the use of room segregation in juvenile detention homes and juvenile correctional facilities that (i) include relevant definitions, criteria for use of room segregation, frequency of required room checks, training requirements for staff, and follow-up requirements after using room segregation; (ii) allow the use of room segregation only when other less restrictive options have been exhausted and for certain purposes; (iii) allow the use of room segregation only for the minimum amount of time required to address the resident's behavior; (iv) provide to the resident a means of communication with staff during room segregation; (v) specify, if a resident in room segregation exhibits self-injurious behavior, when and under what conditions staff shall consult with a mental health professional; and (vi) detail the circumstances under which the director of the juvenile detention home or juvenile correctional facility shall develop a plan for improved behavioral outcomes for the resident.
Title
Juvenile detention homes and correctional facilities; room segregation.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (28-Y 11-N) (Y: 28 N: 11 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services with substitute (13-Y 2-N) (Y: 13 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services with substitute (13-Y 2-N) (Y: 13 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-08 | House | Left in Courts of Justice |
2016-02-22 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table by voice vote |
2016-02-16 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Criminal Law |
2016-02-12 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2016-02-12 | House | Read first time |
2016-02-12 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2016-02-10 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (28-Y 11-N) |
2016-02-09 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB215S1 |
2016-02-09 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 16104644D-S1 |
2016-02-09 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2016-02-09 | Senate | Read second time |
2016-02-08 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-05 | Senate | Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services with substitute (13-Y 2-N) |
2016-02-05 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 16104644D-S1 |
2016-01-05 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Rehabilitation and Social Services |
2016-01-05 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/16 16101860D |