VA SB201 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0679)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0679)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Hospitals; financial assistance; payment plans. Requires hospitals to make reasonable efforts to screen every uninsured patient, defined in the bill, to determine whether the individual is eligible for medical assistance pursuant to the state plan for medical assistance or for financial assistance under the hospital's financial assistance policy and to inform every uninsured patient who receives services at the hospital and who is determined to be eligible for assistance under the hospital's financial assistance policy of the option to enter into a payment plan with the hospital. The bill also prohibits hospitals from engaging in extraordinary collection actions to recover a debt for medical services against any patient unless the hospital has made all reasonable efforts to determine whether the patient qualifies for medical assistance pursuant to the state plan for medical assistance or is eligible for financial assistance under the hospital's financial assistance policy and requires hospitals to annually report data and information regarding the amount of charity care, discounted care, and financial assistance provided under the hospital's financial assistance policy and the amount of uncollected bad debt.
Title
Hospitals; financial assistance for uninsured patient, payment plans.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-11 - Senate - Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-11 - House - House: VOTE: Adoption (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-03-10 - Senate - Senate: Senate acceded to request (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-08 - Senate - Senate: House substitute rejected by Senate (0-Y 39-N) (Y: 0 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2022-03-07 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-03-02 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-01 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-24 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-11 - House - House: VOTE: Adoption (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-03-10 - Senate - Senate: Senate acceded to request (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-08 - Senate - Senate: House substitute rejected by Senate (0-Y 39-N) (Y: 0 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2022-03-07 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-03-02 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-01 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-24 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-11 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0679) | |
2022-04-11 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 679 (effective 7/1/22) | |
2022-03-22 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2022 | |
2022-03-22 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 22, 2022 |
2022-03-22 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2022-03-21 | Senate | Signed by President |
2022-03-21 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB201ER) |
2022-03-21 | Senate | Enrolled |
2022-03-11 | Senate | Conference report agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2022-03-11 | House | VOTE: Adoption (98-Y 0-N) |
2022-03-11 | House | Conference report agreed to by House (98-Y 0-N) |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Conference substitute printed 22107713D-S2 |
2022-03-10 | Conference: Amended by conference committee | |
2022-03-10 | House | Delegates: Orrock, Head, Tran |
2022-03-10 | House | Conferees appointed by House |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Senators: Favola, Barker, Newman |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Conferees appointed by Senate |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Senate acceded to request (40-Y 0-N) |
2022-03-09 | House | House requested conference committee |
2022-03-09 | House | House insisted on substitute |
2022-03-08 | Senate | House substitute rejected by Senate (0-Y 39-N) |
2022-03-07 | House | VOTE: Block Vote Passage (98-Y 0-N) |
2022-03-07 | House | Passed House with substitute BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N) |
2022-03-07 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute SB201H1 |
2022-03-07 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 22107061D-H1 |
2022-03-07 | House | Read third time |
2022-03-04 | House | Read second time |
2022-03-02 | House | Reported from Appropriations (21-Y 0-N) |
2022-03-01 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-25 | House | Assigned App. sub: Health & Human Resources |
2022-02-24 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2022-02-24 | House | Committee substitute printed 22107061D-H1 |
2022-02-24 | House | Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with substitute (22-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-22 | House | Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions |
2022-02-22 | House | Read first time |
2022-02-22 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2022-02-14 | Senate | Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-14 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-14 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB201S1 |
2022-02-14 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 22106183D-S1 |
2022-02-14 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2022-02-14 | Senate | Read second time |
2022-02-11 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Incorporates SB245 (Hashmi) |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 22106183D-S1 |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Reported from Education and Health with substitute (15-Y 0-N) |
2022-01-10 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education and Health |
2022-01-10 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/22 22104042D |
Same As/Similar To
SB245 (Similar To) 2022-02-03 - Incorporated by Education and Health
SB245 (Similar To) 2022-02-03 - Incorporated by Education and Health
HB1071 (Same As) 2022-04-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0678)
HB1071 (Same As) 2022-04-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0678)
SB245 (Similar To) 2022-02-03 - Incorporated by Education and Health
HB1071 (Same As) 2022-04-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0678)
HB1071 (Same As) 2022-04-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0678)
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
32 | 1 | 137.09 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
32 | 1 | 276.5 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |