VA HB1071 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0678)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0678)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Hospitals; financial assistance; payment plans. Requires hospitals to make reasonable efforts to screen every uninsured patient, defined in the bill, to determine whether the individual is eligible for medical assistance pursuant to the state plan for medical assistance or for financial assistance under the hospital's financial assistance policy and to inform every uninsured patient who receives services at the hospital and who is determined to be eligible for assistance under the hospital's financial assistance policy of the option to enter into a payment plan with the hospital. The bill also prohibits hospitals from engaging in extraordinary collection actions to recover a debt for medical services against any patient unless the hospital has made all reasonable efforts to determine whether the patient qualifies for medical assistance pursuant to the state plan for medical assistance or is eligible for financial assistance under the hospital's financial assistance policy and requires hospitals to annually report data and information regarding the amount of charity care, discounted care, and financial assistance provided under the hospital's financial assistance policy and the amount of uncollected bad debt.
Title
Hospitals; financial assistance for uninsured patient, payment plans.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-11 - Senate - Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-11 - House - House: VOTE: Adoption (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-03-08 - Senate - Senate: Senate insisted on substitute with amendment (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-07 - House - House: VOTE: Rejected (0-Y 96-N) (Y: 0 N: 96 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2022-03-03 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute with amendment (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-02 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-01 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations with amendment (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-15 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-10 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-01 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (5-Y 0-N) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-11 - House - House: VOTE: Adoption (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-03-08 - Senate - Senate: Senate insisted on substitute with amendment (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-07 - House - House: VOTE: Rejected (0-Y 96-N) (Y: 0 N: 96 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2022-03-03 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute with amendment (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-02 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-01 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations with amendment (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-15 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-10 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-01 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (5-Y 0-N) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-11 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0678) | |
2022-04-11 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 678 (effective 7/1/22) | |
2022-03-22 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2022 | |
2022-03-22 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 22, 2022 |
2022-03-22 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2022-03-21 | Senate | Signed by President |
2022-03-21 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1071ER) |
2022-03-21 | House | Enrolled |
2022-03-11 | Senate | Conference report agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2022-03-11 | House | VOTE: Adoption (97-Y 0-N) |
2022-03-11 | House | Conference report agreed to by House (97-Y 0-N) |
2022-03-10 | House | Conference substitute printed 22107783D-H2 |
2022-03-10 | Conference: Amended by conference committee | |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Senators: Favola, Barker, Newman |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Conferees appointed by Senate |
2022-03-10 | House | Delegates: Tran, Orrock, Head |
2022-03-10 | House | Conferees appointed by House |
2022-03-09 | House | House acceded to request |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Senate requested conference committee |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Senate insisted on substitute with amendment (39-Y 0-N) |
2022-03-07 | House | VOTE: Rejected (0-Y 96-N) |
2022-03-07 | House | Senate substitute with amendment rejected by House 22106945D-S1 (0-Y 96-N) |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Passed Senate with substitute with amendment (39-Y 0-N) |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute with amendment HB1071S1 |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Committee amendment agreed to |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Reading of amendment waived |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 22106945D-S1 |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Read third time |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2022-03-01 | Senate | Reported from Finance and Appropriations with amendment (16-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Rereferred to Finance and Appropriations |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 22106945D-S1 |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Reported from Education and Health with substitute (15-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education and Health |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2022-02-15 | House | VOTE: Block Vote Passage (100-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-15 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-14 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB1071H1 |
2022-02-14 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 22105937D-H1 |
2022-02-14 | House | Read second time |
2022-02-13 | House | Read first time |
2022-02-10 | House | Committee substitute printed 22105937D-H1 |
2022-02-10 | House | Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with substitute (22-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-01 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (5-Y 0-N) |
2022-01-25 | House | Assigned HWI sub: Subcommittee #3 |
2022-01-12 | House | Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions |
2022-01-12 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/22 22103960D |
Same As/Similar To
SB201 (Same As) 2022-04-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0679)
SB201 (Same As) 2022-04-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0679)
SB201 (Same As) 2022-04-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0679)