VA SB1622 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 5 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-19 - Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 5 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-19 - Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Child day programs; potable water; lead testing. Requires licensed child day programs and certain other programs that serve preschool-age children to develop and implement a plan to test potable water from sources identified by the U.S. Environmental Protection Agency as high priority. The bill requires such plan and the results of each such test to be submitted to the Commissioner of Social Services and the Department of Health's Office of Drinking Water. The bill stipulates that if the result of any such test indicates a level of lead in the potable water that is at or above 15 parts per billion, the program shall remediate the level of lead in the potable water to below 15 parts per billion and confirm such remediation by retesting the water and submitting the results of the retests to the Commissioner of Social Services and the Department of Health's Office of Drinking Water. The bill allows such programs, in lieu of testing or remediation, to use other water sources that meet the U.S. Food and Drug Administration standards for bottled water.
Title
Child day programs; lead testing, potable water, effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-12 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends passing by indefinitely (5-Y 3-N) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-12 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with amendments (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-12 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with amendments (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-19 | House | Left in Appropriations |
2019-02-12 | House | Subcommittee recommends passing by indefinitely (5-Y 3-N) |
2019-02-12 | House | Assigned App. sub: Health & Human Resources |
2019-02-12 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2019-02-12 | House | Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with amendments (21-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-08 | House | Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions |
2019-02-08 | House | Read first time |
2019-02-08 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB1622S1 |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 19106330D-S1 |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Read second time |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-01 | Senate | Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services with substitute (15-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-01 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 19106330D-S1 |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Assigned Rehab sub: Subcommittee #2 |
2019-01-09 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Rehabilitation and Social Services |
2019-01-09 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19104179D |