VA SB1615 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 21 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-21 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0758)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 21 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-21 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0758)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Retail sales and use tax; absorption of tax by a dealer. Authorizes a dealer to absorb all or a portion of the sales and use tax due on an item, so long as the dealer separately states the full amount of the tax due at the point of the sale or transaction and remits the full amount due to the Department of Taxation with the return covering the period in which the sale or transaction took place.
Title
Retail Sales and Use Tax; absorption of tax by a dealer.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-18 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - House - House: Reported from Finance (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-28 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-24 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-23 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - House - House: Reported from Finance (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-28 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-24 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-23 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-21 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0758) | |
2019-03-21 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 758 (effective 7/1/19) | |
2019-03-04 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 26, 2019 | |
2019-03-04 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 4, 2019 |
2019-02-21 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Signed by President |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1615ER) |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Enrolled |
2019-02-18 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-18 | House | Passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-18 | House | Read third time |
2019-02-15 | House | Read second time |
2019-02-13 | House | Reported from Finance (22-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-30 | House | Referred to Committee on Finance |
2019-01-30 | House | Read first time |
2019-01-30 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2019-01-28 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (38-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-25 | Senate | Read second time and engrossed |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-23 | Senate | Reported from Finance (16-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-09 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Finance |
2019-01-09 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19103011D |