VA SB1563 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-01-31 - Incorporated by Education and Health
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]

Summary

School boards; local law-enforcement agencies; memorandums of understanding. Requires the school board in each school division in which the local law-enforcement agency employs school resource officers to enter into a memorandum of understanding with such local law-enforcement agency that sets forth the respective roles and responsibilities of the school board and the law-enforcement agency and the roles and responsibilities of such school resource officers. The bill requires each such school board and local law-enforcement agency to (i) review the memorandum of understanding every two years or at any time upon the request of either party and may revise such memorandum at any time as agreed by the parties and (ii) ensure that all relevant personnel employed by either party are informed of and review the provisions of the memorandum of understanding, including any revisions to the memorandum of understanding. The bill also requires the Virginia Center for School and Campus Safety to develop a model memorandum of understanding that may be used by local school boards and local law-enforcement agencies to satisfy the new requirements put forth in the bill.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

School boards; local law-enforcement agencies, memorandums of understanding.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Incorporated by Education and Health (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-14 - Senate - Senate: Rereferred from Courts of Justice (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-01-31SenateIncorporated by Education and Health
2019-01-23SenateAssigned Education sub: Public Education
2019-01-14SenateRereferred to Education and Health
2019-01-14SenateRereferred from Courts of Justice (13-Y 0-N)
2019-01-09SenateReferred to Committee for Courts of Justice
2019-01-09SenatePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19104306D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
221280.2:3(n/a)See Bill Text
91184(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback