VA SB1550 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-08 - Left in Finance
Pending: Senate Finance and Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-08 - Left in Finance
Pending: Senate Finance and Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Commission for the Commemoration of the Centennial of Women's Right to Vote. Establishes the Commission for the Commemoration of the Centennial of Women's Right to Vote in the legislative branch of state government. The Commission is charged with planning and leading the centennial anniversary of women's right to vote in 2020. The provisions of the bill will expire on September 30, 2020, and the Commission shall submit its report to the Governor and 2021 Session of the General Assembly. The provisions of the bill are contingent on funding in a general appropriation act.
Title
Women's Right to Vote, Commission for Commemoration of; established.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rules (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-08 | Senate | Left in Finance |
2017-02-02 | Senate | Rereferred to Finance |
2017-02-02 | Senate | Reported from Rules (13-Y 0-N) |
2017-01-20 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Rules |
2017-01-20 | Senate | Presented and ordered printed 17104500D |
Subjects
Clerk of the Senate of Virginia
Clerk of the Virginia House of Delegates
Commissions Boards and Institutions Generally
General Assembly
Study Commissions Committees and Reports
Women
Clerk of the Virginia House of Delegates
Commissions Boards and Institutions Generally
General Assembly
Study Commissions Committees and Reports
Women