VA SB1540 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 23 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-23 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0288)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 23 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-23 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0288)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Consumer protection; automatic renewal or continuous service offer to consumer; exemptions. Exempts extended service contract providers, and their affiliates, regulated by the Department of Agriculture and Consumer Services and insurers or entities regulated by Title 38.2 (Insurance) from provisions of law governing automatic renewal and continuous service offers to consumers. The bill also amends the definition of "automatic renewal" to mean a plan or arrangement in which a paid subscription or purchasing agreement is automatically renewed at the end of a definite term for a subsequent term of more than one month. Current law does not specify the length of the subsequent renewal term.
Title
Consumer protection; automatic renewal or continuous service offer to consumer, exemptions.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-02-17 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-14 - House - House: Reported from Commerce and Energy (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-14 - House - House: Reported from Commerce and Energy (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-23 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0288) | |
2023-03-23 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 288 (effective 7/1/23) | |
2023-03-02 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., March 27, 2023 | |
2023-03-02 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 2, 2023 |
2023-02-23 | Senate | Signed by President |
2023-02-22 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2023-02-22 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1540ER) |
2023-02-22 | Senate | Enrolled |
2023-02-17 | House | VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) |
2023-02-17 | House | Passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) |
2023-02-17 | House | Read third time |
2023-02-16 | House | Read second time |
2023-02-14 | House | Reported from Commerce and Energy (21-Y 0-N) |
2023-02-10 | House | Referred to Committee on Commerce and Energy |
2023-02-10 | House | Read first time |
2023-02-10 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2023-02-06 | Senate | Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) |
2023-02-06 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2023-02-06 | Senate | Read second time and engrossed |
2023-02-03 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) |
2023-02-01 | Senate | Reported from General Laws and Technology (14-Y 0-N) |
2023-01-20 | Senate | Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology |
2023-01-20 | Senate | Presented and ordered printed 23104913D |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
59 | 1 | 207.45 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
59 | 1 | 207.48 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |