VA SB1459 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 6 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-06 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0869)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 6 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-06 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0869)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Virginia Higher Education Opportunity Act of 2011. Establishes the Virginia Higher Education Opportunity Act of 2011 for the purpose of fueling strong economic growth in the Commonwealth and preparing Virginians for the top job opportunities in the knowledge-driven economy of the 21st century. The bill provides for (i) a new higher education funding policy; (ii) the calculation of the state general fund share of an institution's basic operations and instruction funding need; (iii) per student enrollment-based funding; (iv) targeted economic and innovation incentives; (v) the creation of a STEM Public-Private Partnership; and (vi) the creation of a Higher Education Advisory Committee. The bill also makes technical amendments. This bill is a recommendation of the Governor's Commission on Higher Education Reform, Innovation and Investment.
Title
Virginia Higher Education Opportunity Act of 2011; established, report.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-04-06 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-06 - Senate - Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation #3 (37-Y 3-N) (Y: 37 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-06 - Senate - Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendations #1, #2, #4, #5 (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-23 - Senate - Senate: House substitute agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-21 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-16 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-16 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (5-Y 0-N) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-24 - Senate - Senate: Rereferred from Education and Health (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-06 - Senate - Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation #3 (37-Y 3-N) (Y: 37 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-06 - Senate - Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendations #1, #2, #4, #5 (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-23 - Senate - Senate: House substitute agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-21 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-16 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-16 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (5-Y 0-N) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-24 - Senate - Senate: Rereferred from Education and Health (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-06 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0869) | |
2011-04-06 | House: Enacted, Chapter 869 (effective 7/1/11) | |
2011-04-06 | House: Signed by Speaker as reenrolled | |
2011-04-06 | Senate: Signed by President as reenrolled | |
2011-04-06 | Senate: Reenrolled bill text (SB1459ER2) | |
2011-04-06 | Senate: Reenrolled | |
2011-04-06 | Governor: Governor's recommendation adopted | |
2011-04-06 | House: VOTE: ADOPTION (98-Y 0-N) | |
2011-04-06 | House: House concurred in Governor's recommendation (98-Y 0-N) | |
2011-04-06 | Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation #3 (37-Y 3-N) | |
2011-04-06 | Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendations #1, #2, #4, #5 (40-Y 0-N) | |
2011-04-05 | Senate: Placed on Calendar | |
2011-03-26 | Senate: Governor's recommendation received by Senate | |
2011-03-06 | Senate: Signed by President | |
2011-03-03 | House: Signed by Speaker | |
2011-03-03 | Senate: Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1459ER) | |
2011-03-03 | Senate: Enrolled | |
2011-02-23 | Senate: Title replaced 11105403D-H1 | |
2011-02-23 | Senate: House substitute agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-21 | House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-21 | House: Passed House with substitute BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-21 | House: Engrossed by House - committee substitute SB1459H1 | |
2011-02-21 | House: Committee substitute agreed to 11105403D-H1 | |
2011-02-21 | House: Read third time | |
2011-02-18 | House: Read second time | |
2011-02-16 | House: Committee substitute printed 11105403D-H1 | |
2011-02-16 | House: Reported from Appropriations with substitute (22-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-16 | House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (5-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-11 | House: Assigned App. sub: Higher Education | |
2011-02-08 | House: Referred to Committee on Appropriations | |
2011-02-08 | House: Read first time | |
2011-02-08 | House: Placed on Calendar | |
2011-02-07 | Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-07 | Senate: Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-07 | Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-04 | Senate: Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB1459S1 | |
2011-02-04 | Senate: Committee substitute agreed to 11104889D-S1 | |
2011-02-04 | Senate: Reading of substitute waived | |
2011-02-04 | Senate: Read second time | |
2011-02-03 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-02 | Senate: Committee substitute printed 11104889D-S1 | |
2011-02-02 | Senate: Reported from Finance with substitute (15-Y 0-N) | |
2011-01-24 | Senate: Rereferred to Finance | |
2011-01-24 | Senate: Rereferred from Education and Health (14-Y 0-N) | |
2011-01-21 | Senate: Referred to Committee on Education and Health | |
2011-01-21 | Senate: Presented and ordered printed 11104125D |
Same As/Similar To
HB2510 (Same As) 2011-04-06 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0828)
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
2 | 2 | 1124 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 2 | 1132 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 2 | 1149 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 2 | 1150 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 2 | 1153 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 2 | 1404.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 2 | 1514 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 2 | 1830 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 2 | 2007 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 2 | 2901 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 2 | 5005 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |