VA SB1444 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 21 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-02-08 - Senate: Left in Finance
Pending: Senate Finance and Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 21 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-02-08 - Senate: Left in Finance
Pending: Senate Finance and Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Prison printing shops. Provides that state institutions of higher education may, but are not required to, purchase the products of print shops in state correctional facilities.
Title
Prison printing shops; higher educational institutions are not required to purchase products.
Sponsors
Sen. John Miller [D] |
Roll Calls
2011-01-28 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-02-08 | Senate: Left in Finance | |
2011-01-28 | Senate: Rereferred to Finance | |
2011-01-28 | Senate: Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services (14-Y 0-N) | |
2011-01-24 | Senate: Assigned Rehab sub: Corrections | |
2011-01-21 | Senate: Referred to Committee on Rehabilitation and Social Services | |
2011-01-21 | Senate: Presented and ordered printed 11104219D |