VA SB1376 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on March 20 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-20 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0665)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on March 20 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-20 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0665)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Civil immunity for certain persons; incidents on school property. Provides that any person who, in good faith and without malice, reports, investigates, or causes an investigation to be made into the activities of any person relating to conduct involving bomb threats or other explosives or alcohol or drug use at a school or institution of higher learning or in connection with a school or institution activity shall be immune from all civil liability that might be incurred as a result of making such a report or investigation. Currently, only certain school and institution personnel enjoy such immunity. The bill also provides that any person is likewise immune if he, in good faith and without malice, reports, investigates, or causes an investigation to be made into information that any person poses a credible danger of serious bodily injury or death to any other person on school property.
Title
Certain persons; immunity for those reporting, etc., individual posing credible danger of injury.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-02-21 - Senate - Senate: House amendments agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-21 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (96-Y 2-N) (Y: 98 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-15 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with amendment (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-21 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (96-Y 2-N) (Y: 98 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-15 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with amendment (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-20 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0665) | |
2013-03-20 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 665 (effective 7/1/13) | |
2013-03-05 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2013-03-04 | Senate | Signed by President |
2013-03-04 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1376ER) |
2013-03-04 | Senate | Enrolled |
2013-02-21 | Senate | House amendments agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N) |
2013-02-21 | House | VOTE: PASSAGE (96-Y 2-N) |
2013-02-21 | House | Passed House with amendments (96-Y 2-N) |
2013-02-21 | House | Engrossed by House as amended SB1376 |
2013-02-21 | House | Amendments by Delegate Albo agreed to |
2013-02-21 | House | Committee amendment agreed to |
2013-02-21 | House | Read third time |
2013-02-20 | House | No action taken |
2013-02-19 | House | Read second time |
2013-02-15 | House | Reported from Courts of Justice with amendment (15-Y 0-N) |
2013-02-15 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2013-02-15 | House | Read first time |
2013-02-15 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2013-02-13 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2013-02-12 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2013-02-12 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2013-02-12 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate |
2013-02-12 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2013-02-12 | Senate | Read first time |
2013-02-11 | Senate | Reported from Courts of Justice (15-Y 0-N) |
2013-02-08 | Senate | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2013-02-08 | Senate | Presented and ordered printed 13104715D |
2013-02-08 | Senate | Introduced at the request of Governor |