VA SB1372 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 11-0)
Status: Passed on February 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-15 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0018)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Income tax; conformity. Advances conformity of the Commonwealth's tax code with the federal tax code to December 31, 2018, effective starting in taxable year 2018. Starting in taxable year 2019, the bill deconforms from the provisions of the federal Tax Cuts and Jobs Act (TCJA) that limit the deduction for state and local taxes and that suspend the overall limit on itemized deductions.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Income tax, state; conformity of taxation system with the IRC.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-12 - Senate - Senate: House substitute agreed to by Senate (38-Y 2-N) (Y: 38 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE #2 (95-Y 4-N) (Y: 95 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - House - House: VOTE: DEFEATED (74-Y 24-N) (Y: 74 N: 24 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-08 - House - House: Reported from Finance with substitute (20-Y 1-N) (Y: 20 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (21-Y 19-N) (Y: 21 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Amendment by Senator Norment agreed to (23-Y 17-N) (Y: 23 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Engrossment reconsidered by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of defeated action agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and defeated by Senate (20-Y 20-N) (Y: 20 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Committee substitute agreed to (21-Y 19-N) (Y: 21 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-30 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance with substitute (11-Y 5-N) (Y: 11 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-15 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0018)
2019-02-15 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 18 (effective 2/15/19)
2019-02-13 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, February 20, 2019
2019-02-13SenateEnrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on February 13, 2019
2019-02-13SenateSigned by President
2019-02-12HouseSigned by Speaker
2019-02-12SenateBill text as passed Senate and House (SB1372ER)
2019-02-12SenateEnrolled
2019-02-12SenateTitle replaced 19106750D-H2
2019-02-12SenateEmergency clause added
2019-02-12SenateHouse substitute agreed to by Senate (38-Y 2-N)
2019-02-11HouseVOTE: PASSAGE #2 (95-Y 4-N)
2019-02-11HousePassed House with substitute (95-Y 4-N)
2019-02-11HouseReconsideration of defeated action agreed to by House
2019-02-11HouseRequires 80 affirmative votes to pass
2019-02-11HouseVOTE: DEFEATED (74-Y 24-N)
2019-02-11HouseDefeated by House (74-Y 24-N)
2019-02-11HousePending question ordered
2019-02-11HouseEngrossed by House - floor substitute SB1372H2
2019-02-11HouseSubstitute by Delegate Jones, S.C. agreed to 19106750D-H2
2019-02-11HouseCommittee substitute rejected 19106584D-H1
2019-02-11HousePassed by temporarily
2019-02-11HouseRead third time
2019-02-11HouseFloor substitute printed 19106750D-H2 (Jones, S.C.)
2019-02-08HouseRead second time
2019-02-08HouseCommittee substitute printed 19106584D-H1
2019-02-08HouseReported from Finance with substitute (20-Y 1-N)
2019-02-06HouseReferred to Committee on Finance
2019-02-06HouseRead first time
2019-02-06HousePlaced on Calendar
2019-02-01SenatePassed Senate (21-Y 19-N)
2019-02-01SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2019-02-01SenatePrinted as engrossed 19106153D-ES1
2019-02-01SenateEngrossed by Senate - committee substitute with amendment SB1372ES1
2019-02-01SenateEmergency clause deleted
2019-02-01SenateAmendment by Senator Norment agreed to (23-Y 17-N)
2019-02-01SenateReading of amendment waived
2019-02-01SenateEngrossment reconsidered by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
2019-02-01SenateReconsideration of defeated action agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
2019-02-01SenateRequires 32 affirmative votes for passage
2019-02-01SenateRead third time and defeated by Senate (20-Y 20-N)
2019-01-31SenateEngrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB1372S1
2019-01-31SenateTitle replaced 19106153D-S1
2019-01-31SenateSubstitute by Senator Saslaw ruled out of order 19106240D-S2
2019-01-31SenateCommittee substitute agreed to (21-Y 19-N)
2019-01-31SenateReading of substitute waived
2019-01-31SenateRead second time
2019-01-31SenatePassed by temporarily
2019-01-31SenateFloor substitute printed 19106240D-S2 (Saslaw)
2019-01-30SenateRead first time
2019-01-30SenateIncorporates SB1739 (Newman)
2019-01-30SenateIncorporates SB1657 (McDougle)
2019-01-30SenateIncorporates SB1631 (Dunnavant)
2019-01-30SenateIncorporates SB1531 (Sturtevant)
2019-01-30SenateIncorporates SB1443 (Stuart)
2019-01-30SenateIncorporates SB1320 (Hanger)
2019-01-30SenateIncorporates SB1237 (DeSteph)
2019-01-30SenateCommittee substitute printed 19106153D-S1
2019-01-30SenateReported from Finance with substitute (11-Y 5-N)
2019-01-08SenateReferred to Committee on Finance
2019-01-08SenatePrefiled and ordered printed with emergency clause; offered 01/09/19 19101062D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
581301(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+sum+SB1372
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+SB1372+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+SB1372S1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+SB1372S2+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+SB1372ES1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+SB1372H1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+SB1372H2+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+SB1372ER+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+CHAP0018+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+S05V0201+SB1372
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0266SB1372+SB1372
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0289SB1372+SB1372
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0290SB1372+SB1372
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0291SB1372+SB1372
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0292SB1372+SB1372
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0293SB1372+SB1372
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0294SB1372+SB1372
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H10V0112+SB1372
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+HV2667+SB1372
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+HV2668+SB1372
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0539SB1372+SB1372

Bill Comments

feedback