VA SB136 | 2008 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 3 2008 - 100% progression
Action: 2008-03-06 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0234)
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 3 2008 - 100% progression
Action: 2008-03-06 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0234)
Summary
Wireless telecommunications devices. Prohibits use of wireless telecommunications devices by persons operating school buses, except in emergencies, or when the vehicle is lawfully parked and for the purposes of dispatching. Use of two-way radio devices authorized by the school bus owner, however, is permitted. This bill is the same as
Title
School buses; prohibits use of wireless telecommunications devices by persons driving.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2008-03-06 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0234) | |
2008-03-03 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 234 (effective 7/1/08) | |
2008-02-26 | Senate: Signed by President | |
2008-02-25 | House: Signed by Speaker | |
2008-02-25 | Senate: Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB136ER) | |
2008-02-25 | Senate: Enrolled | |
2008-02-20 | Senate: House substitute agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0- N) | |
2008-02-18 | House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) | |
2008-02-18 | House: Passed House with substitute BLOCK VOTE (97-Y 0-N) | |
2008-02-18 | House: Engrossed by House - committee substitute SB136H1 | |
2008-02-18 | House: Committee substitute agreed to 083844333-H1 | |
2008-02-18 | House: Read third time | |
2008-02-15 | House: Read second time | |
2008-02-14 | House: Committee substitute printed 083844333-H1 | |
2008-02-14 | House: Reported from Transportation with substitute (22-Y 0-N) | |
2008-02-11 | House: Referred to Committee on Transportation | |
2008-02-11 | House: Read first time | |
2008-02-11 | House: Placed on Calendar | |
2008-01-30 | Senate: Communicated to House | |
2008-01-30 | Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) | |
2008-01-29 | Senate: Printed as engrossed 088731333-E | |
2008-01-29 | Senate: Engrossed by Senate as amended SB136E | |
2008-01-29 | Senate: Committee amendments agreed to | |
2008-01-29 | Senate: Reading of amendments waived | |
2008-01-29 | Senate: Read second time | |
2008-01-28 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) | |
2008-01-24 | Senate: Reported from Transportation with amendments (15-Y 0-N) | |
2008-01-03 | Senate: Referred to Committee on Transportation | |
2008-01-03 | Senate: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/08 088731333 |
Subjects
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?081+sum+SB136 |