VA SB1330 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 16 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-16 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0123)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 16 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-16 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0123)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Board for Rights of the Disabled and Board for the Rights of Virginians with Disabilities. Repeals an obsolete section of the Code of Virginia stating that whenever the terms "Board for Rights of the Disabled" and "Board for the Rights of Virginians with Disabilities" are used, the terms shall mean "Virginia Board for People with Disabilities." The terms "Board for Rights of the Disabled" and "Board for the Rights of Virginians with Disabilities" do not appear in the Code of Virginia. This bill is a recommendation of the Code Commission.
Title
Rights of the Disabled, Board for, & Board for the Rights of Virginians with Disabilities; repeals.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-02-16 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-12 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (20-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-27 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-23 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of Passed by for the day agreed to (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-23 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-22 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-12 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (20-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-27 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-23 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of Passed by for the day agreed to (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-23 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-22 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-16 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0123) | |
2015-03-16 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 123 (effective 7/1/15) | |
2015-02-23 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, Sunday, March 29, 2015 | |
2015-02-23 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on 2/23/15 |
2015-02-20 | Senate | Signed by President |
2015-02-18 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2015-02-18 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1330ER) |
2015-02-18 | Senate | Enrolled |
2015-02-16 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-16 | House | Passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-16 | House | Read third time |
2015-02-13 | House | Read second time |
2015-02-12 | House | Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (20-Y 0-N) |
2015-01-30 | House | Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions |
2015-01-30 | House | Read first time |
2015-01-30 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2015-01-27 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2015-01-26 | Senate | Read second time and engrossed |
2015-01-23 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2015-01-23 | Senate | Reconsideration of Passed by for the day agreed to (39-Y 0-N) |
2015-01-23 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2015-01-23 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2015-01-22 | Senate | Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) |
2015-01-15 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education and Health |
2015-01-15 | Senate | Presented and ordered printed 15101167D |